Cole v. United Healthcare Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Richard Cole, on behalf of himself and others similarly situated and Richard Cole
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv21258
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #22 Attorney Lazaro Fields's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Richard Cole. Lazaro Fields is terminated as counsel of record for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (isc)
July 11, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Lazaro Fields for / by Richard Cole. Responses due by 7/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fields, Lazaro)
July 8, 2019 Filing 21 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #4 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by United Healthcare Insurance Company. Responses due by 7/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pegg, Allen)
June 24, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 Defendant's MOTION to Transfer or, in the Alternative MOTION to Stay in Favor of First-Filed Action filed by United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Pegg, Allen)
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 Defendant's MOTION to Transfer or, in the Alternative MOTION to Stay in Favor of First-Filed Action filed by Richard Cole. Replies due by 6/24/2019. (Casey, Stephanie)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Brief Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Defendant shall respond to the Amended Complaint on or before July 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (isc)
June 13, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #4 Amended Complaint by United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pegg, Allen)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #15 Defendant's Corrected Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Pending Defendant's Motion to Transfer or Stay. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (isc)
June 5, 2019 Filing 15 Corrected MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #4 Amended Complaint Pending Defendant's Motion to Transfer or Stay by United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Pegg, Allen)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #13 without prejudice Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Pending Defendant's Motion to Transfer or Stay. Defendant has failed to fully comply with S.D. Fla. L.R. 7.1(a)(3). Counsel shall identify with specificity the reasonable efforts to confer (including the date, time, and manner of each effort). Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (isc)
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #4 Amended Complaint Pending Defendant's Motion to Transfer or Stay by United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Pegg, Allen)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant's MOTION to Transfer or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Stay in Favor of First-Filed Action ( Responses due by 6/17/2019) by United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pegg, Allen)
May 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Leo VanLandingham on behalf of United Healthcare Insurance Company. Attorney James Leo VanLandingham added to party United Healthcare Insurance Company(pty:dft). (VanLandingham, James)
May 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Paige Pegg on behalf of United Healthcare Insurance Company. Attorney Allen Paige Pegg added to party United Healthcare Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Pegg, Allen)
April 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (isc)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Ursula Ungaro recused. Case reassigned to Judge Darrin P. Gayles for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (vjk)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richard Cole. United Healthcare Insurance Company waiver sent on 4/24/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Casey, Stephanie)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr recused. Case reassigned to Judge Ursula Ungaro for all further proceedings Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 4/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (jc)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Federico A. Moreno recused. Case reassigned to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr., for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (yar)
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against United Healthcare Insurance Company, filed by Richard Cole.(Colson, Dean)
April 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United Healthcare Insurance Company. (lh)
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (lh)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United Healthcare Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11529782, filed by Richard Cole, on behalf of himself and others similarly situated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Casey, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. United Healthcare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: James Leo VanLandingham
Represented By: Allen Paige Pegg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Cole, on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
Represented By: Stephanie Anne Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Cole
Represented By: Stephanie Anne Casey
Represented By: Dean Churchill Colson
Represented By: Lazaro Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?