Latham v. Traci et al

Plaintiff: John Latham
Defendant: Glenna Battle and Gary Traci
Case Number: 1:2019cv21322
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens filed by John Latham; Recommending that: 1. Plaintiff's Complaint ECF #1 be DISMISSED without prejudice for want of prosecution or for failure to comply with Court orders. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b); and, 2. The case CLOSED. Objections to R&R due by 7/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 SECOND Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 9 Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail,,. US Mail returned for: John Latham. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (mp)
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 7 Order to Vacate, 6 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - Chambers and Clerks, #8 Order of Instructions to Pro Se Litigant, #3 Order of Instructions to Pro Se Litigant. US Mail returned for: John Latham. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. RTS (mp)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS Order to Vacate re 5 Order of Instructions to Pro Se Litigant Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/10/2019. (erd)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction. Document 5 Restricted Due to Error. (fbn)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 5/10/2019. Motions due by 5/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (fbn)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (pcs)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Glenna Battle, Gary Traci. Filing fee $ 400.00 Not Paid/No IFP., filed by John Latham.(pcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Latham v. Traci et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenna Battle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Traci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?