De Jesus v. Florida Department of Corrections, Officer Lopez et al

Plaintiff: Francisco De Jesus
Defendant: Florida Department of Corrections, Officer Lopez, Florida Department of Corrections, John Doe, Wexford Health Services Inc., Physician Assistant and Wexford Health Services Inc., Medical Director
Case Number: 1:2019cv21324
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, filed by Francisco De Jesus, #3 Memorandum filed by Francisco De Jesus; Recommending that RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's Complaint ECF #1 , #3 be DISMISSED, without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 7/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE / PRO SE PLAINTIFF ENQUIRY TO FILE 42 USC 1983 by Francisco De Jesus (pcs)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee but Establishing Debt to Clerk of $350.00. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Compliance with Court Order DE#6 by Francisco De Jesus re #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #5 Order Requiring Payment of Filing Fee or Filing IFP Motion, (drz)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Francisco De Jesus. (drz)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 5/10/2019. Motions due by 5/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (fbn)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support of #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 by Francisco De Jesus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E)(ar2) Modified text on 4/9/2019 (ar2).
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (ar2)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Florida Department of Corrections, John Doe, Florida Department of Corrections, Officer Lopez, Wexford Health Services Inc., Medical Director, Wexford Health Services Inc., Physician Assistant. Filing fee $ 400.00 (Not paid/No IFP), filed by Francisco De Jesus.(ar2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Jesus v. Florida Department of Corrections, Officer Lopez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Department of Corrections, Officer Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Department of Corrections, John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Services Inc., Physician Assistant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Services Inc., Medical Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco De Jesus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?