Perry v. State of Florida, Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Alonso Humberto Perry
Defendant: Charlotte Correctional, State of Florida, Department of Corrections, Department of Corrections, Dade Correctional, Lake Correctional and Columbia Correctional
Case Number: 1:2019cv21337
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 PAPERLESS Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid/Case Closed by the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 6/4/2019. (br)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Adopting #6 Report and Recommendations. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (chd)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 Letter re production of Porn magazine from Alonso Humberto Perry (mee)
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on SCREENING COMPLAINT UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens filed by Alonso Humberto Perry; Recommending that: (1)the complaint be DISMISSED, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e), for failure to state claims upon which relief can be granted; and, (2)the case be CLOSED. Objections to R&R due by 5/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee but Establishing Debt to Clerk of $350.00. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alonso Humberto Perry. (jao)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (jao)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against All Defendants. Filing fee $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Alonso Humberto Perry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Inmate Request)(jao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. State of Florida, Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alonso Humberto Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Correctional
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Florida, Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dade Correctional
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Correctional
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Correctional
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?