Loving v. MIAMI DADE COUNTY, FLORIDA et al

Plaintiff: Dyma Loving
Defendant: Miami-Dade County, Florida, Alejandro Giraldo, Miami Dade County Police Department and J.F. Calderon
Case Number: 1:2019cv21351
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT as to Open and Pending Related State Criminal and Administrative Investigations by Miami-Dade County, Florida (Pastor, Bernard)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Teri Guttman Valdes on behalf of Alejandro Giraldo. Attorney Teri Guttman Valdes added to party Alejandro Giraldo(pty:dft). (Valdes, Teri)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER STAYING AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. ORDER granting #6 Motion to Stay. This case is STAYED pending the resolution of the related state criminal and administrative investigations. Counsel for the parties shall provide joint status reports to the Court every sixty (60) days from the date of this Order, informing the Court of the progress of the criminal and administrative investigations.The parties are to immediately notify the Court in writing when it is appropriate to lift the stay. This case is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED for statistical purposes only. This shall not affect the substantive rights of the parties. This case will be reopened upon expiration of the Stay. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Stay of Proceedings by Miami-Dade County, Florida. Attorney Bernard Pastor added to party Miami-Dade County, Florida(pty:dft). Responses due by 5/15/2019 (Pastor, Bernard)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyara L Herard on behalf of Dyma Loving (Herard, Kyara)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to J.F. Calderon, Alejandro Giraldo, Miami Dade County Police Department, Miami-Dade County, Florida. (amb)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against All Defendants. Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11546016, filed by Dyma Loving. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s))(Acosta, Adrian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loving v. MIAMI DADE COUNTY, FLORIDA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Dade County, Florida
Represented By: Bernard Pastor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Giraldo
Represented By: Teri Guttman Valdes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami Dade County Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.F. Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dyma Loving
Represented By: Kyara L Herard
Represented By: Adrian Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?