Drummond v. Inch

Plaintiff: Walter Drummond
Defendant: Mark S. Inch
Case Number: 1:2019cv21399
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 In RESPONSE to #10 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Walter Drummond. (cds)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee but Establishing Debt to Clerk of $350.00. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 6/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Walter Drummond. (lh)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #4 Order Requiring Payment of Filing Fee or Filing IFP Motion, #3 Order of Instructions to Pro Se Litigant, #5 Order, by Walter Drummond. (lh)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 FINAL AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mark S. Inch, filed by Walter Drummond.(lh)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Inquiry by Walter Drummond (docket sheet sent) (cqs)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUA SPONTE ORDER REQUIRING FINAL, AMENDED COMPLAINT. On or before June 24, 2019, the plaintiff shall file an amended complaint in this case on the proper form provided. The plaintiff is cautioned that the Amended Complaint shall be the sole, operative complaint and should not incorporate by reference any prior filed complaints as they will not be considered by the court. ( Amended Complaint due by 6/24/2019 ) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 1983 Complaint Form) (fbn)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 6/24/2019. Motions due by 6/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (fbn)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (ar2)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Mark S. Inch. Filing fee $ 400.00 (Not Paid/No IFP), filed by Walter Drummond.(ar2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drummond v. Inch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark S. Inch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?