Del Rio v. Rhodes, et al
Plaintiff: Jorge Del Rio
Defendant: Unkown Police Officers, Florida Highway Patrol, Terry L. Rhodes, Mark Shoaff and Taren L Castro
Case Number: 1:2019cv21444
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Lynn Eggers on behalf of Mark Shoaff. Attorney Melissa Lynn Eggers added to party Mark Shoaff(pty:dft). (Eggers, Melissa)
July 9, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Lynn Eggers on behalf of Taren L Castro. Attorney Melissa Lynn Eggers added to party Taren L Castro(pty:dft). (Eggers, Melissa)
July 3, 2019 Filing 35 Defendant's MOTION to Stay Discovery and Proceedings by Terry L. Rhodes. Responses due by 7/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eggers, Melissa)
July 1, 2019 Filing 34 Summons Issued as to Taren L Castro, Mark Shoaff. (mc)
June 28, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Defendant Mark Shoaff by Jorge Del Rio (Ohanian, Sebastian)
June 28, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Defendant Taren Castro by Jorge Del Rio (Ohanian, Sebastian)
June 28, 2019 Filing 31 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jorge Del Rio.(Ohanian, Sebastian)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #29 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Unknown Defendants. Plaintiff must perfect service of process on the Unknown Defendants on or before July 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/19/2019. (mhn)
June 19, 2019 Filing 29 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Unknown Defendants re #26 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, by Jorge Del Rio. Responses due by 7/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Ohanian, Sebastian)
June 11, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Lynn Eggers on behalf of Terry L. Rhodes. Attorney Melissa Lynn Eggers added to party Terry L. Rhodes(pty:dft). (Eggers, Melissa)
June 11, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Lynn Eggers on behalf of Florida Highway Patrol. Attorney Melissa Lynn Eggers added to party Florida Highway Patrol(pty:dft). (Eggers, Melissa)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT LIMITED DISCOVERY AND ADOPTING DEADLINE TO PERFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS re: #18 Motion; The Court hereby ADOPTS United States District Judge Cecilia M. Altonagas Order #9 requiring Plaintiff to perfect service of process upon the Defendants, including the Unknown Defendants, on or before July 15, 2019, or show cause why these Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to perfect service of process. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 5/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #10 Motion to Stay pursuant to #11 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and #20 Plaintiff's Stipulation. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 5/29/2019. (mhn)
May 28, 2019 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to Terry L. Rhodes on behalf of Florida Highway Patrol (dj)
May 28, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Alias by Jorge Del Rio (Ohanian, Sebastian)
May 22, 2019 Filing 22 Summons Issued as to Terry L. Rhodes. (dj)
May 17, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) 2nd Corrected by Jorge Del Rio (Ohanian, Sebastian)
May 17, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION re #10 Defendant's MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Adjudication of Motion to Dismiss by Jorge Del Rio (Ohanian, Sebastian)
May 8, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Florida Highway Patrol. (dj)
May 8, 2019 Filing 18 Renewed MOTION Leave to Take Limited Discovery by Jorge Del Rio. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ohanian, Sebastian)
May 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) caption edited by Jorge Del Rio (Ohanian, Sebastian)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz for all further proceedings, Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (yar)
May 3, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Terry L. Rhodes. (dj)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #13 Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
May 3, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Take Limited Discovery by Jorge Del Rio. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Ohanian, Sebastian)
May 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Jorge Del Rio (Ohanian, Sebastian)
May 3, 2019 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Unkown Police Officers, Terry L. Rhodes, filed by Jorge Del Rio.(Ohanian, Sebastian)
May 3, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Adjudication of Motion to Dismiss by Florida Highway Patrol. Responses due by 5/17/2019 (Cole, Tiernan)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that on or before July 15, 2019, Plaintiff shall perfect service upon the Unknown Police Officers or show cause why these Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to perfect service of process. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tiernan Cole on behalf of Florida Highway Patrol. Attorney Tiernan Cole added to party Florida Highway Patrol(pty:dft). (Cole, Tiernan)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that Defendant, Florida Highway Patrol, shall not file a response until all Defendants have been served. After all Defendants have been served, Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers within the time allowed the last-served Defendant to respond. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 5/22/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jorge Del Rio. Jorge Del Rio served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019. (Ohanian, Sebastian)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Florida Highway Patrol. (drz)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Florida Highway Patrol a/p/o Florida Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles. Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11561404, filed by Jorge Del Rio. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ohanian, Sebastian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Del Rio v. Rhodes, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unkown Police Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Highway Patrol
Represented By: Melissa Lynn Eggers
Represented By: Tiernan Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry L. Rhodes
Represented By: Melissa Lynn Eggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Shoaff
Represented By: Melissa Lynn Eggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taren L Castro
Represented By: Melissa Lynn Eggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Del Rio
Represented By: Sebastian Ohanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?