Damian v. Yellow Brick Capital Advisers (UK) Limited
Plaintiff: Melanie E. Damian
Defendant: Yellow Brick Capital Advisers (UK) Limited
Case Number: 1:2019cv21538
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:0077
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 6/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (tb)
June 13, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Melanie E. Damian (Maland, Daniel)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Setting Trial And Pre-Trial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, And Referring Certain Matters To Magistrate Judge: ( Jury Trial set for 4/27/2020 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Calendar Call set for 4/21/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Mediation Deadline 1/6/2020.) Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that Plaintiff shall comply with the May 22, 2019 Order by 6/17/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Yellow Brick Capital Advisers (UK) Limited (Caprio, Courtney)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Melanie E. Damian of Filing Supplemental Proof of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Maland, Daniel)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Melanie E. Damian (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maland, Daniel)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Status Conference held on 6/6/2019. Total time in court: 6 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Daniel Scott Maland, Courtney Anne Caprio, Plaintiff has opted to conduct jurisdictional discovery in anticipation of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. The parties shall complete jurisdictional discovery by July 8, 2019. Defendant shall file its response to the pleading by July 19, 2019. Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ssi)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference, re: jurisdictional discovery, set for 6/6/2019 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting in part #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint; Yellow Brick Capital Advisers (UK) Limited. Answer due 6/10/2019. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Melanie E. Damian. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Yellow Brick Capital Advisers (UK) Limited. Attorney Courtney Anne Caprio added to party Yellow Brick Capital Advisers (UK) Limited(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Caprio, Courtney)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 6/12/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Melanie E. Damian. Yellow Brick Capital Advisers (UK) Limited served on 5/8/2019, answer due 5/29/2019. (Maland, Daniel)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Yellow Brick Capital Advisers (UK) Limited. (ail)
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Melanie E. Damian (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Maland, Daniel)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pcs)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Yellow Brick Capital Advisers (UK) Limited. Filing fees $ 400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 113C-11577273, payment transferred from : 19cv21536, filed by Melanie E. Damian, as Receiver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maland, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Damian v. Yellow Brick Capital Advisers (UK) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yellow Brick Capital Advisers (UK) Limited
Represented By: Courtney Anne Caprio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie E. Damian
Represented By: Corali Lopez-Castro
Represented By: Daniel Scott Maland
Represented By: David Lee Rosendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?