Myeress v. Heidenry et al
Plaintiff: Joe Myeress
Defendant: MDLV, LLC and Reid Heidenry
Case Number: 1:2019cv21568
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Becerra
2 Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS MATTER came before the Court on Defendant Reid Heidenry's Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #9 , and Defendant MDLV, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, ECF No. #11 . Upon consideration of the Motions, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the parties shall appear for Oral Argument before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra on Monday, July 8, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 6 on the 10th Floor of the James Lawrence King Federal Justice Building, 99 N.E. 4th Street, Miami, Florida, 33132. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 6/26/2019. (amz)
June 13, 2019 Filing 27 First MOTION for Hearing re #15 Response in Opposition to Motion, #9 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Reid Heidenry. (Schamy, Brenda)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #25 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. On June 7, 2019, this Court denied Defendants' #22 Motion for Leave and, due to its untimely filing, struck Defendants' #23 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss. Finding no reason to alter its decision, the Court hereby DENIES Defendants' #25 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 6/12/2019. (amz)
June 10, 2019 Filing 25 First MOTION for Reconsideration re #23 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss by Reid Heidenry. (Schamy, Brenda)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PAPERLESS ORDER Denying #22 Motion for Leave and Striking #23 Reply to Response to #9 Motion to Dismiss. On May 7, 2019, Defendant filed its #9 Motion to Dismiss the Complaint. On May 24, 2019, Plaintiff filed its #15 Response in Opposition. Defendant's Reply was due on May 31, 2019. Defendant failed to seek additional time before the due date, and instead, filed its Reply on June 7, 2019. A party seeking additional time to file any pleading, motion, or response with the Court should do so before the deadline to file. Here, the reason Defendant cites for its failure to submit a timely Reply is that the client was out of town. There is no reason why a motion seeking additional time could not have been filed before May 31, 2019. Accordingly, Defendant's #22 Motion is DENIED. In addition, because Defendant filed the Reply without leave to do so, the #23 Reply is STRICKEN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 6/7/2019. (amz)
June 7, 2019 Filing 23 **STRICKEN per DE# 24 *REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, filed by Reid Heidenry. (Schamy, Brenda) Modified text on 6/10/2019 (lh).
June 7, 2019 Filing 22 First MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss by Reid Heidenry. (Schamy, Brenda)
June 4, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MDLV, LLC. (Ostroff, Eric)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING #11 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MDLV, LLC, #9 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, filed by Reid Heidenry. Motions referred to Judge Jacqueline Becerra. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 5/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER STRIKING #17 Notice of Unavailability filed by Reid Heidenry Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 5/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
May 28, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Joe Myeress. Replies due by 6/4/2019. (Rothman, Joel)
May 28, 2019 Filing 17 STRICKEN NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Reid Heidenry for dates of 06/05/2019-07/01/2019 (Schamy, Brenda) Modified PER DE #19 on 5/29/2019 (vmz).
May 24, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #13 Order to Show Cause by Joe Myeress. (Moretto, Ana)
May 24, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, filed by Joe Myeress. Replies due by 5/31/2019. (Moretto, Ana)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO PERFECT SERVICE. Ordered and Adjudged that on or before July 23, 2019, Plaintiff shall perfect service upon the Defendant or show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to perfect service of process. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 5/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (gp)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #9 Motion to Dismiss. Show Cause Response due by 5/24/2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 5/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (gp)
May 15, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by MDLV, LLC (Ostroff, Eric)
May 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by MDLV, LLC. Attorney Eric W. Ostroff added to party MDLV, LLC (pty:dft). Responses due by 5/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ostroff, Eric)
May 8, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Joe Myeress. Reid Heidenry served on 5/1/2019, answer due 5/22/2019. (Rothman, Joel)
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Reid Heidenry. Attorney Brenda Juliet Schamy added to party Reid Heidenry(pty:dft). Responses due by 5/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B)(Schamy, Brenda)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz for all further proceedings, Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (yar)
April 25, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Joe Myeress (Rothman, Joel)
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Joe Myeress (Rothman, Joel)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (vmz)
April 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to MDLV, LLC. (vmz)
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Reid Heidenry. (vmz)
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vmz)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement (Injunctive Relief Demanded) against Reid Heidenry, MDLV, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11584890, filed by Joe Myeress. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s))(Rothman, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myeress v. Heidenry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDLV, LLC
Represented By: Eric W. Ostroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reid Heidenry
Represented By: Brenda Juliet Schamy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Myeress
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Represented By: Ana Paula Moretto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?