Minimally Invasive Spine Center of South Florida, LLC v. United Healthcare Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Minimally Invasive Spine Center of South Florida, LLC
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv21596
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER DISMISSING CASE. THIS MATTER is before the Court on Plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal #9 . Upon review of the notice and the record, the Court ORDERS AND ADJUDGES that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All deadlines and hearings are CANCELED. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 5/20/2019. (sgi)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Minimally Invasive Spine Center of South Florida, LLC (Wickhorst, George)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #3 . Plaintiff shall file its response on or before May 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 5/16/2019. (sgi)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #3 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Minimally Invasive Spine Center of South Florida, LLC. (Wickhorst, George)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by United Healthcare Insurance Company of Filing Relevant State Court Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Plaintiff's Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2. Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3. Notice of Non-Service and Summons Issued to Defendant, #4 Exhibit 4. Notice of Service of Process and Summons Issued to Defendant, #5 Exhibit 5. Defendant's Notice of Removal) (Alter, Daniel)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT Re: Removal by United Healthcare Insurance Company (Alter, Daniel)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES, referring case to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for all discovery disputes and non-dispositive pretrial motions. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 5/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by United Healthcare Insurance Company. Responses due by 5/16/2019 (Alter, Daniel)
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pcs)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11589681, filed by United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit "A" Declaration of Mabel S. Fairly, #3 Exhibit "B" State Court Action)(Alter, Daniel) No Answer / Motion to Dismiss filed. Text Modified on 4/26/2019 (pcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minimally Invasive Spine Center of South Florida, LLC v. United Healthcare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Alter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minimally Invasive Spine Center of South Florida, LLC
Represented By: George William Wickhorst, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?