Butler v. Joseph
Plaintiff: Michael H. Butler
Defendant: Sgt. Butler and Sergeant Joseph
Case Number: 1:2019cv21650
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff submitted the required inmate account statement DE#20 . Accordingly, Plaintiff may proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee but Establishing Debt to Clerk of $350.00. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/2/2019. (lt00)
July 2, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Compliance by Michael H. Butler Re: 19 Order on Motion for Extension of Time. (ar2)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff seeks an extension of time to submit the required inmate account statement to support his motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's is permitted a 21-day extension to submit the statement, which is due on or before June 26, 2019. Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 6/5/2019. (lt00)
June 4, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to comply with the Court Order to submit a 6 month Trust Fund in order to proceed in forma pauperis by Michael H. Butler. Responses due by 6/18/2019 (lk)
May 29, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Joseph filed in response to DE #8 Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Michael H. Butler.(lk)
May 29, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael H. Butler. (Address modified) (lk)
May 21, 2019 Reset Deadlines Per DE#14. Inmate Account Statement Deadline 6/4/2019. (cqs)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff filed his motion to proceed in forma pauperis but failed to submit the supporting statement certified by the appropriate institutional officer showing all receipts, expenditures, and balances during the last six months for any institutional account in her name. Accordingly, on or before June 4, 2019, Plaintiff shall file the required supporting, certified inmate account statement, or pay the Clerks filing fee of $400.00. See also this Court's order granting Plaintiff an extension of time. DE# 14 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid (lt00)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff seeks an extension of time to submit the required inmate account statement to support his motion to proceed in forma pauperis. See DE#9 . Plaintiff's is permitted a 14-day extension to submit the statement, which is due on or before June 4, 2019. Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/21/2019. (lt00)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #10 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff's motion notices this Court of the correct name of the defendant. This Court sua sponte corrected the data entry error upon receipt of the transfer of this case. Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion is DENIED as MOOT. Plaintiff is still subject to this Court's order to amend the complaint DE#8 . The amended complaint remains due on or before May 30, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/21/2019. (lt00)
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Court Order to Supply with Institution Record of Spending by Michael H. Butler. Responses due by 6/3/2019 (mc)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael H. Butler (System Updated) (mc)
May 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Michael H. Butler. Responses due by 5/29/2019 (lk)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael H. Butler. (lk)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO AMEND on or before May 30, 2019, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint providing a short and plain statement of a claim, a basis for federal jurisdiction, and a demand for judgment. Plaintiff shall be provided a form complaint for use. ( Amended Complaint due by 5/30/2019 ) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 1983 Complaint Form) (fbn)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 5/30/2019. Motions due by 5/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (fbn)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (bb)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from Florida Middle; Case Number 6:19-cv-00732. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(bb).
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER transferring case to the United States District Court, Southern District of Florida, Miami Division. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 4/26/2019. (SC)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 4/19/2019. (copy mailed)(AKC)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sgt. Butler filed by Michael H. Butler. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (no filing fee paid and no motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed)(RDO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael H. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?