PAYNE et al v. ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AG et al

Plaintiff: NOE RIVERON, JUAN ZAMORA, KRYSTINA BONILLA, ALEJANDRO RAMIREZ, ALEXIA BOUCLIER, GRISSELL DENIZARD, ARMANDO PAZ, JR., GILBERTO PEREZ, BRIAN CHAIKEN, EDUARDO CONSUEGRA, ALEXANDER PEREZ, ANDREA ACOSTA, SAMUEL CHOC, THOMAS PAYNE, JOSE PORTILLO, DANNY BUSTAMANTE, BERNADETTE POLANSKY, MICHAEL HINES, RYAN CRESPO, YONI BREVE and MARLENE MARTINEZ
Defendant: TRW AUTOMOTIVE U.S. LLC, TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC., TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA, INC., HONDA OF AMERICA MFG., INC., HYUNDAI MOTOR GROUP, TOYOTA MOTOR CORP., HONDA R&D CO., LTD., ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AG, KIA MOTORS CORP., ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORPO., AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD., TRW VEHICLE SAFETY SYSTEMS, INC., TRW AUTOMOTIVE, INC., HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA, HYUNDAI MOTOR CO. and KIA MOTORS AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv21681
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Courtesy Copy of Motion of Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchett, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson, Gary E. Samouris and Nida Edith Samson for Centralization of Related Actions in the Central District of California, or in the Alternative, the Eastern District of Michigan, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 re MDL-2905. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Corrected Proof of Service)(mc)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters; Notice re Joint Motions; Expedited Service Deadline 7/1/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/1/2019. (kou)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD., HONDA OF AMERICA MFG., INC., HONDA R&D CO., LTD., HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA, HYUNDAI MOTOR CO., HYUNDAI MOTOR GROUP, KIA MOTORS AMERICA, KIA MOTORS CORP., TOYOTA MOTOR CORP., TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA, INC., TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC., TRW AUTOMOTIVE U.S. LLC, TRW AUTOMOTIVE, INC., TRW VEHICLE SAFETY SYSTEMS, INC., ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AG, ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORPO.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11602707, filed by DANNY BUSTAMANTE, SAMUEL CHOC, NOE RIVERON, ANDREA ACOSTA, THOMAS PAYNE, JUAN ZAMORA, ALEJANDRO RAMIREZ, BERNADETTE POLANSKY, ALEXANDER PEREZ, GRISSELL DENIZARD, MARLENE MARTINEZ, GILBERTO PEREZ, BRIAN CHAIKEN, KRYSTINA BONILLA, RYAN CRESPO, ARMANDO PAZ, JR., JOSE PORTILLO, EDUARDO CONSUEGRA, ALEXIA BOUCLIER, MICHAEL HINES, YONI BREVE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Prieto, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAYNE et al v. ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW AUTOMOTIVE U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONDA OF AMERICA MFG., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HYUNDAI MOTOR GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONDA R&D CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIA MOTORS CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORPO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW VEHICLE SAFETY SYSTEMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW AUTOMOTIVE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HYUNDAI MOTOR CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIA MOTORS AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOE RIVERON
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN ZAMORA
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRYSTINA BONILLA
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEJANDRO RAMIREZ
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXIA BOUCLIER
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRISSELL DENIZARD
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARMANDO PAZ, JR.
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GILBERTO PEREZ
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN CHAIKEN
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDUARDO CONSUEGRA
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXANDER PEREZ
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREA ACOSTA
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUEL CHOC
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS PAYNE
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE PORTILLO
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANNY BUSTAMANTE
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERNADETTE POLANSKY
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL HINES
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN CRESPO
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YONI BREVE
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARLENE MARTINEZ
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?