Joe Hand Promotions, Inc v. PHILLIPS et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc
Defendant: DONNA PHILLIPS, Mary E PHILLIPS, Perry Wings Plus Inc and Perry Wings Plus, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv21723
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc Notice of Withdrawal of Filing Proposed Summons (Kaniuk, Ronald)
June 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc (Kaniuk, Ronald)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 5/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND ORDER REFERRING NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL AND DISCOVERY Matters to the Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 5/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to DONNA PHILLIPS, Mary E PHILLIPS, Perry Wings Plus, Inc.. (jas)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc re #1 Complaint filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc (Kaniuk, Ronald)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case Notice of Filing: Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kaniuk, Ronald)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (Copy Complaint and AO 121 mailed out.) (ebz)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (ebz)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11607649, filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.(Kaniuk, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc v. PHILLIPS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc
Represented By: Ronald Scott Kaniuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONNA PHILLIPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary E PHILLIPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Wings Plus Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Wings Plus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?