In re: Mark Fields
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Petitioner: Kiesel Law LLP
In Re: Mark Fields
Case Number: 1:2019cv21748
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 37 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 7/1/2019. Total time in court: 39 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Paul R. Kiesel, Stephanie M. Taft, Michael D. Resnick, and Nathan C. Zipperian appeared on behalf of the Plaintiffs; Martin Gary Toole appeared on behalf of the Defendant. Michael Brady and Terrance Wayne Anderson, Jr. appeared on behalf of Mark Fields. Order entered D.E. #7 . (**SEALED Digital 14:05:41**) (sl)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re 31 Sealed Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 7/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (kmh)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #34 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jodi M. Schebel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 7/1/2019. (kmh)
July 1, 2019 Filing 34 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for M. Gary Toole. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 113C-11775066. Filing Fee $ 75.00 by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 7/15/2019 (Toole, Martin)
June 28, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Martin Gary Toole on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Attorney Martin Gary Toole added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft). (Toole, Martin)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Telephonic Hearing on 31 *SEALED* Joint Statement for 7/1/2019 at 2:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Counsel shall call the conference number 1-888-684-8852 at the appointed time, then enter access code 4791317 and security code 0701. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 6/26/2019. (kmh)
June 24, 2019 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 31 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1050926)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #27 MOTION to Seal; granting #28 Corrected MOTION to Seal. Plaintiffs may file an unredacted version of #29 Joint Statement under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 6/24/2019. (kmh)
June 21, 2019 Filing 29 Statement of: Redacted Joint Statement of the Parties Regarding the Scope of Mark Fields' Testimony by Kiesel Law LLP re #28 Corrected MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' CORRECTED Motion to File Under Seal Certain Portions of the Parties' Joint Statement per Local Rule 5.4 (Zipperian, Nathan)
June 21, 2019 Filing 28 Corrected MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' CORRECTED Motion to File Under Seal Certain Portions of the Parties' Joint Statement per Local Rule 5.4 by Kiesel Law LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie M. Taft In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal) (Zipperian, Nathan)
June 21, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Motion to File Under Seal Certain Portions of the Parties' Joint Statement per Local Rule 5.4 by Mark Fields. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie M. Taft in support of Plaintiff's Motion to File Under Seal) (Zipperian, Nathan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 26 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 6/12/19 before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes, 1-32 pages, Court Reporter: Diane Miller, 561-514-3728 / Diane_Miller@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/10/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2019. (dmr)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1 COMPLAINT /Motion to Quash Subpoena and for Entry of a Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 6/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (kmh)
June 12, 2019 Filing 24 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Miscellaneous Hearing on held on 6/12/2019 on Complaint/Motion to Quash Subpoena and for Entry of a Protective Order. Total time in court: 36 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Michael G. Brady and Terrance Wayne Anderson, Jr. appeared on behalf of Non-Party Mark Fields; Paul R. Kiesel, Nathan C. Zipperian (by phone) and Michael D. Resnick (by phone) appeared on behalf of the Plaintiffs. Order to follow. (Digital 14:02:04) (sl)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul R. Kiesel; granting #22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael D. Resnick. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 6/4/2019. (kmh)
June 3, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael D. Resnick. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11696846 by Kiesel Law LLP. Responses due by 6/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael D. Resnick, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Zipperian, Nathan)
June 3, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Paul R. Kiesel. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11696520 by Kiesel Law LLP. Responses due by 6/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Paul R. Kiesel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Zipperian, Nathan)
May 23, 2019 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 20 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (515074)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 MOTION to Seal. Non-Party Mark Fields may file an unredacted version of #18 REPLY and Exhibit A under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 5/23/2019. (kmh)
May 23, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Seal Exhibits and Certain Portions of their Opposition to Non-Party Witness Mark Fields' Motion to Quash and for Entry of a Protective Order per Local Rule 5.4 filed by Mark Fields. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Shinkle, Theodore)
May 23, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Mark Fields. (Shinkle, Theodore)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephanie M. Taft. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 5/21/2019. (kmh)
May 20, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Stephanie M. Taft. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11659518 by Kiesel Law LLP. Responses due by 6/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Stephanie M. Taft, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Zipperian, Nathan)
May 16, 2019 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 14 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1050926)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 MOTION to Seal. Plaintiffs may file an unredacted version of #12 RESPONSE in Opposition and Exhibits 1-7 under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 5/16/2019. (kmh)
May 16, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Seal Exhibits and Certain Portions of their Opposition to Non-Party Witness Mark Fields' Motion to Quash and for Entry of a Protective Order per Local Rule 5.4 REDACTED PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO NON-PARTY MARK FIELDS' MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA AND FOR ENTRY OF A PROTECTIVE ORDER, AND REQUEST TO TRANSFER MOTION TO THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA filed by Kiesel Law LLP. Replies due by 5/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Declaration of Stephanie M. Taft In Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibits 1-7 (REDACTED))(Zipperian, Nathan)
May 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Seal Exhibits and Certain Portions of their Opposition to Non-Party Witness Mark Fields' Motion to Quash and for Entry of a Protective Order per Local Rule 5.4 by Kiesel Law LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie M. Taft In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Zipperian, Nathan)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael G. Brady. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 5/14/2019. (kmh)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Unopposed EMERGENCY MOTION. The Hearing on #1 COMPLAINT/Motion to Quash Subpoena and for Entry of a Protective Order set for 5/16/2019 at 10:00 AM is hereby RESET to 6/12/2019 at 2:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Plaintiffs' counsel may appear at the hearing by telephone. Plaintiffs' counsel shall call the conference number 1-888-684-8852 at the appointed time, then enter access code 4791317 and security code 0612. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 5/13/2019. (kmh)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included by Kiesel Law LLP. Responses due by 5/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Zipperian, Nathan)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael G. Brady. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11639631 by Mark Fields. Responses due by 5/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shinkle, Theodore)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan C. Zipperian on behalf of Kiesel Law LLP. Attorney Nathan C. Zipperian added to party Mark Fields(pty:inre). (Zipperian, Nathan) Modified on 5/20/2019 to correct filer (bb).
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER setting Hearing on #1 COMPLAINT /Motion to Quash Subpoena and for Entry of a Protective Order for 5/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 5/8/2019. (kmh)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes per DE 3 . (vjk)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for all pretrial matters. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (isc)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ail)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT /Motion to Quash Subpoena and for Entry of a Protective Order against All Plaintiffs. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11610148, filed by Mark Fields. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shinkle, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Mark Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Mark Fields
Represented By: Theodore Livingston Shinkle
Represented By: Terrance Wayne Anderson, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan C. Zipperian
Represented By: Michael G. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kiesel Law LLP
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Michael D. Resnick
Represented By: Stephanie M. Taft
Represented By: Nathan C. Zipperian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Jodi M. Schebel
Represented By: Martin Gary Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?