Vidyashev v. Miami Worldcenter Associates, LLC

Plaintiff: Igor Vidyashev
Defendant: Miami Worldcenter Associates, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv21752
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Miami Worldcenter Associates, LLC. Attorney Robert Michael Stein added to party Miami Worldcenter Associates, LLC(pty:dft). (Stein, Robert)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ON DEFAULT PROCEDURES,( Miami Worldcenter Associates, LLC response due 6/19/2019.)( Motions due by 6/26/2019.) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Igor Vidyashev. Miami Worldcenter Associates, LLC served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (Sanchelima, Christian)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (kpe)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Miami Worldcenter Associates, LLC. (kpe)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Miami Worldcenter Associates, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11611007, filed by Igor Vidyashev. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Sanchelima, Christian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vidyashev v. Miami Worldcenter Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Igor Vidyashev
Represented By: Christian Jay Sanchelima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami Worldcenter Associates, LLC
Represented By: Robert Michael Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?