Glover v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Lessie Glover
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and LM General Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv21900
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #11 Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Lessie Glover. LM General Insurance Company served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Normand, Edmund)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 6/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (tb)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 5/26/2020 in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Calendar Call set for 5/19/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Amended Pleadings due by 7/30/2019., All Discovery due by 1/27/2020., Expert Discovery due by 1/27/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 7/30/2019., In Limine Motions due by 3/10/2020., Motions due by 2/11/2020., Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/10/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 2/3/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (lk) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 19, 2019 Filing 19 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lessie Glover (Shamis, Andrew)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that by 6/20/2019 Plaintiff shall comply with the June 5, 2019 Order. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 19, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to LM General Insurance Company. (lk)
June 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) to Liberty Mutual Ins. Co. and LM General Ins. Co. by Lessie Glover (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Normand, Edmund)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #11 Amended Complaint filed by Lessie Glover; Plaintiff must file proof of service on LM General Insurance Company by July 8, 2019. Defendant, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, shall not file a response until Defendant, LM General Insurance Company has been served. Defendants shall then file a combined response or separate answers to the Amended Complaint within the time permitted by the Rules for the last-served Defendant to respond. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc. for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Lavisky, Matthew)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Lessie Glover (Shamis, Andrew)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying as moot #6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lessie Glover. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s))(Normand, Edmund)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer. The Court does not delay the entry of a scheduling order in anticipation of parties being added to the case; indeed, the scheduling order will indicate a deadline by which to add parties. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #7 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Lavisky, Matthew)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #6 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint: Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2019 08:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by by 6/17/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney Matthew John Lavisky added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft). Responses due by 6/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lavisky, Matthew)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacob Lawrence Phillips on behalf of Lessie Glover. Attorney Jacob Lawrence Phillips added to party Lessie Glover(pty:pla). (Phillips, Jacob)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edmund Alonso Normand on behalf of Lessie Glover. Attorney Edmund Alonso Normand added to party Lessie Glover(pty:pla). (Normand, Edmund)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (ar2)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11635315, filed by Lessie Glover. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summon(s))(Shamis, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glover v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lessie Glover
Represented By: Andrew John Shamis
Represented By: Edmund Alonso Normand
Represented By: Jordan David Utanski
Represented By: Jacob Lawrence Phillips
Represented By: Garrett O. Berg
Represented By: Rachel N. Dapeer
Represented By: Scott Adam Edelsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew John Lavisky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?