Santos-Pineda v. General Marketing Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Agustin Santos-Pineda
Defendant: Walmart Corporation, Maxi/Climber 1-100 Does and General Marketing Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv21945
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Denying #8 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (ap00)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Hearing, MOTION for Reconsideration re #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Agustin Santos-Pineda. (jas)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Agustin Santos-Pineda. (jas)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (ap00)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Agustin Santos-Pineda. (drz)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against All Defendants, filed by Agustin Santos-Pineda.(nc)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Agustin Santos-Pineda to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: Kennypee89@gmail.com (cds)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR A CIVIL CASE against General Marketing Solutions, LLC, Maxi/Climber 1-100 Does, Walmart Corporation. Filing fees (Not Paid/No IFP) $400.00 filed by Agustin Santos-Pineda. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cds) Modified to reflect Plaintiff has two different mailing address on 5/15/2019 (mr1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santos-Pineda v. General Marketing Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxi/Climber 1-100 Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Marketing Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agustin Santos-Pineda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?