Amador v. The State of Florida et al
Plaintiff: Randy Amador
Defendant: Sheriff Paul Blackman and The State of Florida
Case Number: 1:2019cv21963
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 PAPERLESS Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid/Case Closed by the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/3/2019. (br)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #5 Report and Recommendations. Petitioners Petition, ECF No. #1 , is DISMISSED without prejudice; Certificate of Appealability: DENIED. The Clerk shall CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO SERVE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. ( Objections to R&R due by 6/27/2019). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2) (Copy of DE #5 Order mailed to Craig Manahan at the address listed).
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 28 USC 2241 case re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Randy Amador Recommending that the instant habeas petition be DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction, and that th. US Mail returned for: Randy Amador. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (mp)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUA SPONTE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS RE DISMISSAL on 28 USC 2241 case re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Randy Amador; Recommending that the instant habeas petition be DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction, and that the case be closed. Objections to R&R due by 6/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
May 23, 2019 Attorney Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney and Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe terminated. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe. (lr)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DIRECTIONS of filing Highlands County Circuit Court, Case No. 282007CT000716TTAXMX to be made part of the instant federal habeas corpus record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Highlands County Circuit Court Case No. 292007CT000716TTAXMX) (fbn)
May 15, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid added. Per DE 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment. (jc)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 5/15/2019 in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number FLS000011733 (ls)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (ls)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 EMERGENCY PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Filing fee $ 5.00 Receipt#: FLS000011733, filed by Randy Amador.(ls) Modified text on 5/15/2019 (jc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amador v. The State of Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Paul Blackman
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Florida
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Amador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?