Beacon Fisheries v. Mowi ASA et al
Plaintiff: Beacon Fisheries
Defendant: Mowi ASA, Grieg Seafood ASA, Marine Harvest USA, LLC, Marine Harvest Canada, Inc., Ducktrap River of Maine LLC, Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., Bremnes Seashore AS, Ocean Quality North America Inc., SalMar ASA, Scottish Sea Farms Ltd., Leroy Seafood Group ASA, Leroy Seafood USA, Inc, Grieg Seafood BC Ltd., Ocean Quality AS, Grieg Seafood Rogaland As and Grieg Seafood Finnmark As
Case Number: 1:2019cv21967
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. Per order #16 (mr1)
May 22, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per DE #16 Order. Closing Case. (kpe)
May 22, 2019 Cases associated. (kpe)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Order granting #9 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Order consolidating 19cv21967 into the Master Docket number 19-21551-CIV-ALTONAGA. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to CLOSE Case No. 19-21967-CIV-ALTONAGA/Goodman for administrative purposes only. All future filings in this case shall be made under Case No. 19-21551-CIV-ALTONAGA/Goodman. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee) Modified on 5/22/2019 (kpe).
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
May 21, 2019 Filing 12 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 5/22/2019 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE accepted and signed on 5/21/19 by Judge Altonaga. Magistrate Judge Judge Kathleen M. Williams no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 5/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) Modified on 5/21/2019 (ps1).
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for William E. Hoese. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11660013 by Beacon Fisheries. Responses due by 6/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dominguez, Manuel)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Beacon Fisheries. Responses due by 5/31/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consolidation Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dominguez, Manuel)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Randall B. Weill. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11656807 by Beacon Fisheries. Responses due by 5/31/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dominguez, Manuel)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael S. Smith. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11656453 by Beacon Fisheries. Responses due by 5/31/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dominguez, Manuel)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES, order referring REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G.Torres for Discovery Matters, Notice of Court Practice. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 5/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Paul Hansel on behalf of Beacon Fisheries. Attorney Gregory Paul Hansel added to party Beacon Fisheries(pty:pla). (Hansel, Gregory)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, into CM/ECF. (Dominguez, Manuel)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case. Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (mee)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mee)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11648130, filed by Beacon Fisheries. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dominguez, Manuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beacon Fisheries v. Mowi ASA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beacon Fisheries
Represented By: Manuel Juan Dominguez
Represented By: Michael S. Smith
Represented By: Gregory Paul Hansel
Represented By: Randall B. Weill
Represented By: William E. Hoese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mowi ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grieg Seafood ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marine Harvest USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marine Harvest Canada, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ducktrap River of Maine LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bremnes Seashore AS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Quality North America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SalMar ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottish Sea Farms Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Seafood Group ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Seafood USA, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grieg Seafood BC Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Quality AS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grieg Seafood Rogaland As
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grieg Seafood Finnmark As
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?