THE FISHING LINE LLC v. MOWI ASA, et al

Plaintiff: THE FISHING LINE LLC, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated and THE FISHING LINE LLC
Defendant: Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., Bremnes Seashore AS, Ocean Quality North America Inc., Scottish Sea Farms Ltd., SalMar ASA, Leroy Seafood USA Inc., Ocean Quality USA Inc., Leroy Seafood Group ASA, Grieg Seafood ASA, Marine Harvest USA, LLC, Grieg Seafood BC Ltd., Ocean Quality AS, MOWI ASA (f/k/a MARINE HARVEST ASA), Marine Harvest Canada, Inc., Ducktrap River of Maine LLC and Mowi ASA
Case Number: 1:2019cv22011
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 Cases associated. per order of consolidation (mr1)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to CLOSE Case No. 19-22011- CIV-ALTONAGA/Goodman for administrative purposes only. All future filings in this case shall be made under Case No. 19-21551- CIV-ALTONAGA/Goodman. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 5/22/2019 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 5/20/19. Judge Marcia G. Cooke no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters; Notice re Joint Motions; Expedited Service Deadline 7/19/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (kou)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bremnes Seashore AS, Ducktrap River of Maine LLC, Grieg Seafood ASA, Grieg Seafood BC Ltd., Leroy Seafood Group ASA, Leroy Seafood USA Inc., Marine Harvest Canada, Inc., Marine Harvest USA, LLC, Mowi ASA, Ocean Quality AS, Ocean Quality North America Inc., Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., Ocean Quality USA Inc., SalMar ASA, Scottish Sea Farms Ltd.. (amb)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT [CLASS ACTION] against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11656444, filed by THE FISHING LINE LLC, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Mowi ASA, #3 Summon(s) Marine Harvest USA, LLC, #4 Summon(s) Marine Harvest Canada, Inc., #5 Summon(s) Ducktrap River of Maine, LLC, #6 Summon(s) Grieg Seafood ASA, #7 Summon(s) Grieg Seafood BC Ltd, #8 Summon(s) Bremnes Seashore AS, #9 Summon(s) Ocean Quality AS, #10 Summon(s) Ocean Quality North America, #11 Summon(s) Ocean Quality USA, #12 Summon(s) Ocean Quality Premium Brands, #13 Summon(s) SalMar ASA, #14 Summon(s) Leroy Seafood Group ASA, #15 Summon(s) Leroy Seafood USA, Inc., #16 Summon(s) Scottish Sea Farms Ltd)(Ebner, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE FISHING LINE LLC v. MOWI ASA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bremnes Seashore AS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Quality North America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottish Sea Farms Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SalMar ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Seafood USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Quality USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Seafood Group ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grieg Seafood ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marine Harvest USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grieg Seafood BC Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Quality AS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOWI ASA (f/k/a MARINE HARVEST ASA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marine Harvest Canada, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ducktrap River of Maine LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mowi ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE FISHING LINE LLC, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Steven Michael Ebner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE FISHING LINE LLC
Represented By: Steven Michael Ebner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?