Parra v. LexisNexis Risk Solutions FL, Inc.

Plaintiff: Sarah Parra
Defendant: LexisNexis Risk Solutions FL, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv22022
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James Lawrence King
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LexisNexis Risk Solutions FL, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent RELX Inc. for LexisNexis Risk Solutions FL, Inc. (Cula, Steven)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven S. Cula on behalf of LexisNexis Risk Solutions FL, Inc.. Attorney Steven S. Cula added to party LexisNexis Risk Solutions FL, Inc.(pty:dft). (Cula, Steven)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/1/2020. Motions due by 7/6/2020. Pretrial Stipulation due by 8/28/2020. Jury Trial set for 11/2/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Calendar Call set for 10/29/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2020 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 7/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (ch1) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by LexisNexis Risk Solutions FL, Inc.. Attorney Christopher Patrick Hammon added to party LexisNexis Risk Solutions FL, Inc.(pty:dft). (Hammon, Christopher)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to LexisNexis Risk Solutions FL, Inc.. (kpe)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LexisNexis Risk Solutions FL, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11658385, filed by Sarah Parra. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Georges-Pierre, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parra v. LexisNexis Risk Solutions FL, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LexisNexis Risk Solutions FL, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Patrick Hammon
Represented By: Steven S. Cula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Parra
Represented By: Anthony Maximillien Georges-Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?