Feder v. CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Feder
Defendant: CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv22058
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added Jeffrey Feder, Stanford Blake. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation)(Krutchik, Laurence)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/26/2020 in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Calendar Call set for 10/20/2020 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 7/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Jeffrey Feder (Attachments: #1 Schedule Jointly Proposed by the Parties)(Krutchik, Laurence)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC. (Ginsberg, Randy)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.. Attorney Randy Scott Ginsberg added to party CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.(pty:dft). (Ginsberg, Randy)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jeffrey Feder. CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC. served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Krutchik, Laurence)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Matthew L. Turner. The Clerk shall add pro hac counsel as co-counsel of record for Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 5/30/2019. (EGT)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Matthew L. Turner. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11668675 by Jeffrey Feder. Responses due by 6/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Matthew L. Turner, Esq., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Krutchik, Laurence)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order of Referral And Notice Of Court Practices And Procedures. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 5/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re #1 Complaint. Docket Text Does Not Match Document; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter a title in the docket text that matches the title of the document. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile the document. (jas)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC. (vmz)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vmz)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11664831, filed by Jeffrey Feder. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Krutchik, Laurence) Modified text on 5/22/2019 (jas).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feder v. CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.
Represented By: Randy Scott Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Feder
Represented By: Laurence Marc Krutchik
Represented By: Matthew L. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?