Bent v. Ft. Lauderdale Hospitality, Inc.
Plaintiff: Arkeyveyia Bent
Defendant: Ft. Lauderdale Hospitality, Inc. d/b/a Red Carpet Inn and Ft. Lauderdale Hospitality, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv22060
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Arkeyveyia Bent. Attorney Max Lloyd Horowitz added to party Arkeyveyia Bent(pty:pla). Replies due by 7/23/2019. (Horowitz, Max)
July 10, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Ft. Lauderdale Hospitality, Inc. Notice Of Rule 26(d)(1) Joint Stipulation To Permit Discovery To Plaintiffs Former Attorney (Davis, Daniel)
June 27, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as per DE 17 re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), . Responses due by 7/16/2019 (lk)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 #16 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff may file a response to the motion to dismiss by no later than July 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/27/2019. (mmd)
June 26, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #13 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), , #15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #13 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Remova Amended by Arkeyveyia Bent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Georges-Pierre, Anthony)
June 25, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #13 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Arkeyveyia Bent. (Georges-Pierre, Anthony)
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT Removal Status Report by Ft. Lauderdale Hospitality, Inc. (Davis, Daniel)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), ( Responses due by 7/1/2019) by Ft. Lauderdale Hospitality, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Charge of Discrimination)(Davis, Daniel)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER CANCELLING HEARING and Granting Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Former Attorney to Attend Mediation. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmd)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #4 : Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2019 02:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmd)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 Plaintiff's MOTION to Extinguish Attorney Charging Lien by Arkeyveyia Bent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Georges-Pierre, Anthony)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Former Attorney to Attend Mediation filed by Ft. Lauderdale Hospitality, Inc.. (Davis, Daniel)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmd)
June 7, 2019 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline as per DE 7 : Ft. Lauderdale Hospitality, Inc. response due 6/21/2019. (lk)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint by June 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/5/2019. (mmd)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Former Attorney to Attend Mediation filed by sina negahbani. Attorney Sina Negahbani added to party sina negahbani(pty:cr). Replies due by 6/12/2019. (Negahbani, Sina)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Ft. Lauderdale Hospitality, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Ex. 1 - Proposed Order on Motion)(Davis, Daniel)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Former Attorney to Attend Mediation by Ft. Lauderdale Hospitality, Inc.. Responses due by 6/14/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Ex. 1 - Proposed Order on Motion)(Davis, Daniel)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (ar2)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11664973, filed by Ft. Lauderdale Hospitality, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Waiver of Service, #4 Exhibit C)(Davis, Daniel) Modified text on 5/22/2019 (ar2). (No answer/motion to dismiss filed).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bent v. Ft. Lauderdale Hospitality, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkeyveyia Bent
Represented By: Anthony Maximillien Georges-Pierre
Represented By: Max Lloyd Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ft. Lauderdale Hospitality, Inc. d/b/a Red Carpet Inn
Represented By: Daniel Ezra Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ft. Lauderdale Hospitality, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Ezra Davis
Represented By: Evelyn Greenstone Kammet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?