Auf v. Medford et al
Plaintiff: Dr. Rehab Auf
Defendant: Dr. Anthony K. Wutoh, Howard University, Dr. Edna Green Medford, Dr. Wayne A.I. Frederick and Dr. Robert Catchings
Case Number: 1:2019cv22065
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Stay All Proceeding Pending Resolution of EEOC Complaint and Vacating Court Orders re #34 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer, #33 Order, ( Responses due by 8/1/2019), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jao)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND, granting in part #29 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re #26 MOTION to Vacate Entry of Default, #28 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #9 Amended Complaint .( Responses due by 7/18/2019, Responses due by 8/9/2019) Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 07/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
July 10, 2019 Filing 32 Opposition to Stay Discovery and Scheduling until deciding the Motion to Dismiss/Response in Opposition as to #29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #23 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents, #27 MOTION for Hearing re #15 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, #28 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of filed by Rehab Auf. Replies due by 7/17/2019. (jao)
July 10, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Request to Extend Time to Respond as to, #26 MOTION to Vacate Entry of Default, #28 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #9 Amended Complaint by Rehab Auf. (jao)
July 10, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Strike Defaulted Defendants from Submitted Motions re #28 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #9 Amended Complaint , #29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #23 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents, #27 MOTION for Hearing re #15 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, #28 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of by Rehab Auf. Responses due by 7/24/2019 (jao)
July 5, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #23 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents, #27 MOTION for Hearing re #15 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, #28 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #9 Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Robert Catchings, Wayne A.I. Frederick, Howard University, Edna Green Medford, Anthony K. Wutoh. (Levin, David)
July 5, 2019 Filing 28 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #9 Amended Complaint by Robert Catchings, Wayne A.I. Frederick, Howard University, Edna Green Medford, Anthony K. Wutoh. Responses due by 7/19/2019 (Levin, David)
July 1, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION TO REQUEST SCHEDULING THE CASE re #15 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report by Rehab Auf. (jao)
June 26, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Vacate Entry of Default by Robert Catchings, Wayne A.I. Frederick, Edna Green Medford, Anthony K. Wutoh. Attorney David Brian Levin added to party Robert Catchings(pty:dft), Attorney David Brian Levin added to party Wayne A.I. Frederick(pty:dft), Attorney David Brian Levin added to party Edna Green Medford(pty:dft), Attorney David Brian Levin added to party Anthony K. Wutoh(pty:dft). Responses due by 7/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levin, David)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Howard University. Answer due 7/10/2019. Re: #9 Amended Complaint filed by Rehab Auf. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 6/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
June 24, 2019 Filing 23 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Memorandum of Law by Rehab Auf./ Responses due by 7/8/2019 (jao)
June 21, 2019 Filing 24 PLAINTIFF OPPOSING MEMORANDUM/RESPONSE to Motion re #18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, filed by Rehab Auf. Replies due by 7/1/2019. (jao) Modified on 6/24/2019 (jao).
June 19, 2019 Filing 22 Clerks Entry of Default as to Dr. Edna Medford, Dr. Anthony Wutoh, Dr. Wayne Frederick, Dr. Robert Catchings. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 6/19/2019. (jas) Modified on 6/19/2019 (jas).
June 19, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Robert Catchings, Wayne A.I. Frederick, Edna Green Medford, Anthony K. Wutoh by Rehab Auf. (jas)
June 19, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to #1 Complaint, filed by Rehab Auf. Replies due by 6/26/2019. (jas)
June 19, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Howard University Concerning Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Levin, David)
June 18, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Howard University. Attorney David Brian Levin added to party Howard University(pty:dft). (Levin, David)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Rodney Smith for all further proceedings. Judge Beth Bloom no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (bms)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER striking #14 Motion to Produce. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 06/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 06/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 STRICKEN per order on DE #16 MOTION/Request for Production Upon Defendants by Rehab Auf. (pes) Modified on 6/3/2019 (jao).
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #9 Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Rehab Auf. Robert Catchings served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019; Wayne A.I. Frederick served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019; Howard University served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019; Edna Green Medford served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019; Anthony K. Wutoh served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (pes)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO VOLUNTEER ATTORNEY PROGRAM re: granting #11 Motion for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 REOUEST TO PARTICIPATE IN THE COURT'S Volunteer Attorney Program by Rehab Auf. (drz)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Robert Catchings, Wayne A.I. Frederick, Howard University, Edna Green Medford, Anthony K. Wutoh. (drz)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Robert Catchings, Wayne A.I. Frederick, Howard University, Edna Green Medford, Anthony K. Wutoh, filed by Rehab Auf.(drz)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 5/24/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number FLS100187871. (jcs)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; The Complaint, ECF No. #1 , is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE ( Amended Complaint due by 6/3/2019.); denying as moot #4 Motion for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Darrin P. Gayles recused. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Bloom for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 5/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (vjk)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Rehab Auf to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: auf.rehab@outlook.com (ar2)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program by Rehab Auf. (ar2)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rehab Auf. (ar2)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Robert Catchings, Wayne A.I. Frederick, Howard University, Edna Green Medford, Anthony K. Wutoh. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Rehab Auf. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(ar2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auf v. Medford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Anthony K. Wutoh
Represented By: David Brian Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard University
Represented By: David Brian Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Edna Green Medford
Represented By: David Brian Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Wayne A.I. Frederick
Represented By: David Brian Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Robert Catchings
Represented By: David Brian Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Rehab Auf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?