Rey v. Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections

Plaintiff: Maximiliano Rey
Defendant: Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2019cv22067
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of filing Miami Dade County Circuit Court Case No. F14-25152, on-line state trial, and appellate dockets to be made part of the instant federal habeas corpus record. Clerk mailed a copy of all Exhibits to Petitioner. (Attachments: ( Main Attachment) Online Trial Docket Case No. F-14-025152, #1 Judgment : Case No. F14025152, #2 Sentence: Case No. F11030171, #3 Sentence: Case No. F12010420, #4 Inmate Information Detail, #5 Online Trial Docket Case No. F12010420, #6 Online Trial Docket Case No. F11030171, #7 Order Granting Def's Motion Case No. F12-10420, #8 Order Denying Motion for Clarification, #9 Notice of Appeal Case No(s): F11-030171 and F12-010420, #10 Moot: Case No(s): F11-030171 and F12-010420) (fbn)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254., filed by Maximiliano Rey.(cqs)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING NON-COMPLIANCE ANDFOR AMENDED PETITION on or before July 8, 2019, Petitioner shall file an amended 2254 motion that complies with the applicable rules of procedure set forth in this order, and that cures the pleading deficiencies identified in this order., ( Amended Complaint due by 7/8/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 6/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 2254 Complaint Form) (fbn)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/23/2019. (rm01)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Maximiliano Rey. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Affidavit Certificate and other Financial Documents)(jao)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (jao)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00. IFP Filed, filed by Maximiliano Rey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Various State Court Documents)(jao) Modified on 5/22/2019 to CORRECT file date(jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rey v. Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maximiliano Rey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?