Pino v. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest

Plaintiff: Francis Pino
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Case Number: 1:2019cv22077
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Lauren Fleischer Louis
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 7/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (aw)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION, order Scheduling Mediation before John W. Salmon. Mediation Hearing set for 10/17/2019 09:30 AM. Mediation Report due on or before October 21,2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re #7 Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing. Parties/Mediator Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties/mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties/Mediator and add the additional parties/mediator. (cbr)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added Francis Pino. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lopez, Anthony)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 7/20/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 7/14/2020 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Amended Pleadings due by 8/13/2019., Discovery due by 3/24/2020., Expert Discovery due by 3/24/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 8/13/2019., Mediation Deadline 4/7/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2020., In Limine Motions due by 4/15/2020., Motions due by 4/15/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/6/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 4/7/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest (Attachments: #1 Attachment A to JSR)(Harwood, Susan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Kegley, Eric)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON POST-REMOVAL PROCEDURES, AND REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES, Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report( Joint Scheduling Report due by 6/13/2019) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Francis Pino v. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11667736, filed by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. No answer/motion to dismiss filed.(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Composite Exhibit B)(Kegley, Eric)Text Modified on 5/23/2019 (mee).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pino v. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Represented By: Eric Christian Kegley
Represented By: Susan Banks Harwood
Represented By: James Miller Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Pino
Represented By: Maximo Alexander Santiago
Represented By: Anthony Manuel Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?