Lindor v. Warden

Plaintiff: Jean Mari Lindor
Defendant: Warden
Case Number: 1:2019cv22090
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. 2241 on or before forty-five days from the date of this order, the respondent shall file a memorandum of fact and law to show cause why this motion should not be granted and shall file therewith all documents and transcripts necessary for the resolution of this petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER re #9 Response in Objection to Order. This Court construes petitioner's motion as a motion for reconsideration of the Court's order to amend. Upon further review of petitioner's pleadings, it appears that he has filed the following: an 11-page habeas petition listing grounds 1-4 [ECF 1]; a 32-page memorandum of law addressing grounds 1-17 [ECF 4]; a copy of the memorandum of law [ECF 1-1, pp. 3-8]; and approximately 50 pages of exhibits [ECF 1-1, pp. 9-59]. Local Rule 7.1(c)(2) states that "neither a motion and its incorporated memorandum of law" shall exceed (20) pages. However, in petitioner's case, several of the documents provided appear to be copies, and many of the grounds raised involve overlapping or related issues. Accordingly, petitioner's response, construed as a motion for reconsideration is granted. Given the number of documents and exhibits filed by the petitioner, and for purposes of clarity of the record, the Court will consider petitioner's petition [ECF 1], along with his memorandum of law [ECF 4] as the operative petition in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/16/2019. (rm01)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Objection to #8 Order regarding Non-Compiiance and Amended Petition (lk)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING NON-COMPLIANCE ANDFOR AMENDED PETITION on or before July 8, 2019, Petitioner shall file an amended 2241 motion that complies with the applicable rules of procedure set forth in this order, and that cures the pleading deficiencies identified in this order. ( Amended Complaint due by 7/8/2019 ) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 6/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 2241 Complaint Form) (fbn)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 6/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 6/4/2019. (rm01)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Austin Watts-Fitzgerald on behalf of Warden. Attorney Thomas Austin Watts-Fitzgerald added to party Warden(pty:dft). (Watts-Fitzgerald, Thomas)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM of Law re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Jean Mari Lindor. (ebz)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jean Mari Lindor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Trulincs Account Transactions-Commissary Personal Inmate Information)(ebz)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (ebz)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Filing fee $ 5.00. IFP Filed, filed by Jean Mari Lindor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ebz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindor v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Thomas Austin Watts-Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Mari Lindor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?