Wood Mountain Fish LLC v. Mowi ASA (fka Marine Harvest ASA) et al
Plaintiff: Wood Mountain Fish LLC
Defendant: Mowi ASA (fka Marine Harvest ASA), Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., Bremnes Seashore AS, Scottish Sea Farms Ltd., Harvest USA, LLC, Marine Harvest Canada Inc., SalMar ASA, Ocean Quality North America Inc. and Leroy Seafood Group ASA
Case Number: 1:2019cv22128
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lauren Fleischer Louis
Referring Judge: Rodney Smith
2 Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dianne Olivia Fischer on behalf of Marine Harvest Canada Inc., Mowi ASA (fka Marine Harvest ASA). Attorney Dianne Olivia Fischer added to party Marine Harvest Canada Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Dianne Olivia Fischer added to party Mowi ASA (fka Marine Harvest ASA)(pty:dft). (Fischer, Dianne)
July 18, 2019 Filing 68 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marine Harvest Canada Inc., Mowi ASA (fka Marine Harvest ASA) (Silverman, Lawrence)
July 18, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence Dean Silverman on behalf of Marine Harvest Canada Inc., Mowi ASA (fka Marine Harvest ASA). Attorney Lawrence Dean Silverman added to party Marine Harvest Canada Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lawrence Dean Silverman added to party Mowi ASA (fka Marine Harvest ASA)(pty:dft). (Silverman, Lawrence)
July 18, 2019 Filing 66 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed for Service Abroad by Wood Mountain Fish LLC. Grieg Seafood BC Ltd. served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Goldstein, Jayne)
July 18, 2019 Filing 65 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed for Service Abroad by Wood Mountain Fish LLC. Marine Harvest Canada Inc. served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Goldstein, Jayne)
July 18, 2019 Filing 64 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bremnes Seashore AS identifying Corporate Parent Bremnes Fryseri AS for Bremnes Seashore AS (Kolcun, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 PAPERLESS ORDER striking #55 Motion; granting #60 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Eric P. Barstad. The Court finds that the application satisfies the requirements of S.D. Fla. Local Atty. R. 4. Therefore, the Clerk is directed to add Eric P. Barstad, Esq., as counsel of record for Defendant Bremnes Seashore AS. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/17/2019. (dco)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #54 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Ryan W. Marth. The Court finds that the application satisfies the requirements of S.D. Fla. Local Atty. R. 4. Therefore, the Clerk is directed to add Ryan W. Marth, Esq., as counsel of record for Defendant Bremnes Seashore AS. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/17/2019. (dco)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #53 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Stephen P. Safranski. The Court finds that the application satisfies the requirements of S.D. Fla. Local Atty. R. 4. Therefore, the Clerk is directed to add Stephen P. Safranski, Esq., as counsel of record for Defendant Bremnes Seashore AS. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/17/2019. (dco)
July 17, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Eric P. Barstad. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 113C-11819343. Filing Fee $ 75.00 by Bremnes Seashore AS. Responses due by 7/31/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolcun, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Striking #55 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Eric P. Barstad. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11819343 filed by Bremnes Seashore AS by Bremnes Seashore AS (Kolcun, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Filing 58 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Wood Mountain Fish LLC. Ducktrap River of Maine LLC served on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Goldstein, Jayne)
July 17, 2019 Filing 57 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Wood Mountain Fish LLC. Marine Harvest USA, LLC served on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Goldstein, Jayne)
July 17, 2019 Filing 56 Clerks Notice to Filer re #55 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Eric P. Barstad. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11819343. Document Not Captioned; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document with the proper caption pursuant to Local Rules. (vmz)
July 16, 2019 Filing 55 STRICKEN MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Eric P. Barstad. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11819343 by Bremnes Seashore AS. Responses due by 7/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolcun, Michael) Modified TEXT on 7/18/2019 (vmz).
July 16, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ryan W. Marth. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11819328 by Bremnes Seashore AS. Responses due by 7/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolcun, Michael)
July 16, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Stephen P. Safranski. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11819210 by Bremnes Seashore AS. Responses due by 7/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolcun, Michael)
July 16, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Anthony Kolcun, Jr on behalf of Bremnes Seashore AS. Attorney Michael Anthony Kolcun, Jr added to party Bremnes Seashore AS(pty:dft). (Kolcun, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 51 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed for Service Abroad by Wood Mountain Fish LLC. Ocean Quality North America Inc. served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Goldstein, Jayne)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #47 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Caroline Stanton. The Court finds that the application satisfies the requirements of S.D. Fla. Local Atty. R. 4. Therefore, the Clerk is directed to add Caroline Stanton, Esq., as counsel of record for Defendant Leroy Seafood USA Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/15/2019. (dco)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #46 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney David I. Gelfand. The Court finds that the application satisfies the requirements of S.D. Fla. Local Atty. R. 4. Therefore, the Clerk is directed to add David I. Gelfand, Esq., as counsel of record for Defendant Leroy Seafood USA Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/15/2019. (dco)
July 12, 2019 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Leroy Seafood USA Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Austevoll Seafood ASA for Leroy Seafood USA Inc. (Welstead, Christine)
July 12, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for CAROLINE STANTON. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11806257 by Leroy Seafood USA Inc.. Responses due by 7/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification CERTIFICATION OF CAROLINE STANTON, #2 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Welstead, Christine)
July 12, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for DAVID I. GELFAND. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11806179 by Leroy Seafood USA Inc.. Responses due by 7/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification CERTIFICATION OF DAVID I. GELFAND, #2 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Welstead, Christine)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Approval of Plan for Alternative Service of Process on Norwegian Defendants. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (dco)
July 9, 2019 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., Ocean Quality USA Inc. (Salem, Sara)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #42 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Karen Hoffman Lent. The Court finds that the application satisfies the requirements of S.D. Fla. Local Atty. R. 4. Therefore, the Clerk is directed to add Karen Hoffman Lent, Esq., as counsel of record for Defendant Marine Harvest USA, LLC and Ducktrap River of Maine LLC. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/8/2019. (dco)
July 3, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Karen Hoffman Lent. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 113C-11786847. Filing Fee $ 75.00 by Ducktrap River of Maine LLC, Marine Harvest USA, LLC. Responses due by 7/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing)(Silverman, Lawrence)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Paul M. Eckles. The Court finds that the application satisfies the requirements of S.D. Fla. Local Atty. R. 4. Therefore, the Clerk is directed to add Paul M. Eckles, Esq., as counsel of record for Defendant Marine Harvest USA, LLC and Ducktrap River of Maine LLC. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/3/2019. (dco)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Joint Scheduling Report due by 8/5/2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (dco)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 PAPERLESS ORDER VACATING #19 Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/3/2019. (dco)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Ocean Quality USA, Inc., Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., Marine Harvest USA, LLC, Ducktrap River of Maine, LLC, and Leroy Seafood USA Inc., shall respond to the #1 Complaint by no later than August 2, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/3/2019. (dco)
July 3, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Paul M. Eckles. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11786985 by Ducktrap River of Maine LLC, Marine Harvest USA, LLC. Responses due by 7/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Paul M. Eckles, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing)(Silverman, Lawrence)
July 3, 2019 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ducktrap River of Maine LLC, Marine Harvest USA, LLC (Silverman, Lawrence)
July 3, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence Dean Silverman on behalf of Ducktrap River of Maine LLC, Marine Harvest USA, LLC. Attorney Lawrence Dean Silverman added to party Ducktrap River of Maine LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Lawrence Dean Silverman added to party Marine Harvest USA, LLC(pty:dft). (Silverman, Lawrence)
July 3, 2019 Filing 34 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,, by Leroy Seafood USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Welstead, Christine)
July 3, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE to #19 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, Plaintiff's Response to Judge Ungaro's Directive to File a Joint Scheduling Report by July 5, 2019 by Wood Mountain Fish LLC. (Goldstein, Jayne)
July 1, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sara Leann Salem on behalf of Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., Ocean Quality USA Inc.. Attorney Sara Leann Salem added to party Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sara Leann Salem added to party Ocean Quality USA Inc.(pty:dft). (Salem, Sara)
July 1, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christine L. Welstead on behalf of Leroy Seafood USA Inc.. Attorney Christine L. Welstead added to party Leroy Seafood USA Inc.(pty:dft). (Welstead, Christine)
July 1, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Carl Seipp, Jr on behalf of Leroy Seafood USA Inc.. Attorney John Carl Seipp, Jr added to party Leroy Seafood USA Inc.(pty:dft). (Seipp, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Wood Mountain Fish LLC. Leroy Seafood USA Inc. served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Goldstein, Jayne)
June 28, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Wood Mountain Fish LLC. Ocean Quality USA Inc. served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Goldstein, Jayne)
June 27, 2019 Filing 27 STATUS REPORT by Wood Mountain Fish LLC (Goldstein, Jayne)
June 27, 2019 Filing 26 Plaintiff's MOTION for Approval of Plan for Alternative Service of Process on Norwegian Defendants and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Wood Mountain Fish LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Heidi M. Silton in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Dkt 29 Order re Alt Serv, #3 Exhibit 2 - Mowi Contact, #4 Exhibit 3 - Marine Harvest to more than double, #5 Exhibit 4 - FL Corp Name Chg Mowi, #6 Exhibit 5 - Contact Ocean Quality, #7 Exhibit 6 - Grieg Seafood Contact, #8 Exhibit 7 - Sales Grieg Seafood, #9 Exhibit 8 - Contact us Bremnes Seashore, #10 Exhibit 9 - SalMar, #11 Exhibit 10 - Leroy Seafood Contact, #12 Exhibit 11 - Hague Service Abroad, #13 Exhibit 12- Outline Hague Service Convention, #14 Exhibit 13 - Translation and Hague Blog, #15 Exhibit 14 - Norway HCCH Authority, #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Jayne)
June 27, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Wood Mountain Fish LLC. Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc. served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Goldstein, Jayne)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 6/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #9 MOTION to Appoint Interim Class Counsel Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 6/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (lh)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT to Judge Rodney Smith for all further proceedings, Judge Ursula Ungaro no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 6/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (yar)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Elizabeth C. Pritzker. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 6/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
June 10, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Elizabeth C. Pritzker. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11715580 by Wood Mountain Fish LLC. Responses due by 6/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Elizabeth C. Pritzker, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Jayne)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Setting Initial Planning And Scheduling Conference, ( Scheduling Conference set for 7/19/2019 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Joint Scheduling Report due by 7/5/2019 Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 6/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Fred T. Isquith. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 6/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Thomas H. Burt. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 6/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Veronica M. Bosco. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 6/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Heidi M. Siton. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 6/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice #8 Motion to Transfer and Coordinate with Related Consolidated Class Actions & Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related, or Similar Actions. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 6/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Fred T. Isquith. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11701239 by Wood Mountain Fish LLC. Responses due by 6/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Fred T. Isquith, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Jayne)
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Thomas H. Burt. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11701188 by Wood Mountain Fish LLC. Responses due by 6/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Thomas H. Burt, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Jayne)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Veronica M. Bosco. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11701116 by Wood Mountain Fish LLC. Responses due by 6/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Veronica M. Bosco, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Jayne)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Heidi M. Silton. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11701037 by Wood Mountain Fish LLC. Responses due by 6/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Heidi M. Silton, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Jayne)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Fred T. Isquith (Appointment as Interim Class Counsel) by Wood Mountain Fish LLC. Responses due by 6/14/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, #2 Declaration of Fred T. Isquith in Support, #3 Exhibit A to Fred Isquith Declaration - 5-13-19 Consolidation Order of Judge Altonaga, #4 Exhibit B to Fred Isquith Declaration - Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related, or Similar Actions and Motion to Transfer and Coordinate, #5 Exhibit C to Fred Isquith Declaration - Firm Resume of Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP, #6 Exhibit D to Fred Isquith Declaration - Hearing transcript portions, #7 Exhibit E to Fred Isquith Declaration - SFMS Firm Resume, #8 Exhibit F to Fred Isquith Declaration - Lockridge Grindal Firm Resume, #9 Exhibit G to Fred Isquith Declaration - Pritzger Levine LLP, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Jayne)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Transfer and Coordinate with Related Consolidated Class Actions & Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related, or Similar Actions by Wood Mountain Fish LLC. (Attachments: #1 Errata A - Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Jayne)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Richard J. Vita, mailing date May 28, 2019, (cco)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Elizabeth C. Pritzker, mailing date May 28, 2019, (cco)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Heidi M. Silton, mailing date May 28, 2019, (cco)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Fred Taylor Isquith, Thomas H. Burt, Veronica Bosco, mailing date May 28, 2019, (cco)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bremnes Seashore AS, Ducktrap River of Maine LLC, Grieg Seafood ASA, Grieg Seafood BC Ltd., Harvest USA, LLC, Leroy Seafood Group ASA, Leroy Seafood USA Inc., Marine Harvest Canada Inc., Mowi ASA (fka Marine Harvest ASA), Ocean Quality AS, Ocean Quality North America Inc., Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., Ocean Quality USA Inc., SalMar ASA, Scottish Sea Farms Ltd.. (vmz)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vmz)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bremnes Seashore AS, Ducktrap River of Maine LLC, Grieg Seafood ASA, Grieg Seafood BC Ltd., Harvest USA, LLC, Leroy Seafood Group ASA, Leroy Seafood USA Inc., Marine Harvest Canada Inc., Mowi ASA (fka Marine Harvest ASA), Ocean Quality AS, Ocean Quality North America Inc., Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., Ocean Quality USA Inc., SalMar ASA, Scottish Sea Farms Ltd.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11674763, filed by Wood Mountain Fish LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summonses)(Goldstein, Jayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood Mountain Fish LLC v. Mowi ASA (fka Marine Harvest ASA) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mowi ASA (fka Marine Harvest ASA)
Represented By: Lawrence Dean Silverman
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc.
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bremnes Seashore AS
Represented By: Stephen P. Safranski
Represented By:
Represented By:
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottish Sea Farms Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvest USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marine Harvest Canada Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence Dean Silverman
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SalMar ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Quality North America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Seafood Group ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wood Mountain Fish LLC
Represented By: Jayne Arnold Goldstein
Represented By: Fred T. Isquith
Represented By: Richard J. Vita
Represented By: Heidi M. Silton
Represented By:
Represented By:
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?