Pickett v. State of Florida
Plaintiff: Juvon Devon Pickett
Defendant: State of Florida
Case Number: 1:2019cv22139
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 6/11/2019. (rm01)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Juvon Devon Pickett. (lbc)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER. The Court has undertaken review of Petitioner's latest filing [ECF 6] and has determined that there is no "emergency" before the Court. Instead, petitioner alleges, as he did in his initial petition for writ of habeas corpus [ECF 1], that he has been misidentified and that he did not violate his probation in Miami-Dade Case No. F9802062A as alleged. Such an allegation does not constitute an "emergency." Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 6/10/2019. (rm01)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Emergency regarding Writ of Habeas Corpus by Juvon Devon Pickett (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (lbc)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DIRECTIONS of filing Miami Dade County Circuit Court Case No. F-98-030602-A to be made part of the instant federal habeas corpus record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Case No. F-98-030602-A) (fbn)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 6/27/2019. Motions due by 6/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (fbn)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (jao)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00(Not Paid/ No IFP Filed), filed by Juvon Devon Pickett.(jao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pickett v. State of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Florida
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juvon Devon Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?