HESH'S SEAFOOD, INC. v. MOWI ASA et al

Plaintiff: HESH'S SEAFOOD, INC.
Defendant: Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., MOWI ASA (f/k/a MARINE HARVEST ASA), SalMar ASA, Scottish Sea Farms Ltd., OCEAN QUALITY USA, INC., Bremnes Seashore AS, MOWI DUCKTRAP, LLC (f/k/a DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC), Leroy Seafood USA, Inc., Leroy Seafood Group ASA, Grieg Seafood BC Ltd., Grieg Seafood ASA, Ocean Quality AS, MOWI USA, LLC (f/k/a MARINE HARVEST USA, LLC), Ocean Quality North America, Inc., Mowi ASA, Mowi Ducktrap, LLC and Mowi USA, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv22166
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per Order DE5. Closing Case. (pcs)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/30/2019. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-21551-CMA, 1:19-cv-22166-CMA (pcs)
May 31, 2019 Cases associated. (pcs)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 5/30/19. Judge Darrin P. Gayles no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 5/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pcs)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pcs)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bremnes Seashore AS, Grieg Seafood ASA, Grieg Seafood BC Ltd., Leroy Seafood Group ASA, Leroy Seafood USA, Inc., MOWI ASA (f/k/a MARINE HARVEST ASA), MOWI DUCKTRAP, LLC (f/k/a DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC), MOWI USA, LLC (f/k/a MARINE HARVEST USA, LLC), OCEAN QUALITY USA, INC., Ocean Quality AS, Ocean Quality North America, Inc., Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc., SalMar ASA, Scottish Sea Farms Ltd.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11680522, filed by HESH'S SEAFOOD, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Prieto, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HESH'S SEAFOOD, INC. v. MOWI ASA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOWI ASA (f/k/a MARINE HARVEST ASA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SalMar ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottish Sea Farms Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN QUALITY USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bremnes Seashore AS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOWI DUCKTRAP, LLC (f/k/a DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Seafood USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Seafood Group ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grieg Seafood BC Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grieg Seafood ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Quality AS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOWI USA, LLC (f/k/a MARINE HARVEST USA, LLC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Quality North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mowi ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mowi Ducktrap, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mowi USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HESH'S SEAFOOD, INC.
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?