Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. v. Nunez et al
Trustee: Nancy Neidich and United States Trustee
Appellee: Aleida C. Nunez
Appellant: Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv22175
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Motion to Stay. Upon review of the record and motion, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that all judicial proceedings in this matter are STAYED until further notice of the Court. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 7/24/2019. (sgi)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Briefing on Appeal by Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc.. Responses due by 7/23/2019 (Rice, Edwin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 7/26/2019. (jc)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of HEARING held on 5/7/2019 before Judge LAUREL M ISICOFF, 1-16 pages, Court Reporter: ACCESS TRANSCRIPTS, LLC. Telephone number: (855) 873-2223. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/22/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/17/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/13/2019. (dcn)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of CONFIRMATION HEARING held on 03/05/2019 before Judge LAUREL M ISICOFF, 1-3 pages, Court Reporter: ACCESS TRANSCRIPTS, LLC. Telephone number: (855) 873-2223. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/5/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/17/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/13/2019. (dcn)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Appellant's Designation, #3 Appellant's Designated Items, #4 Claim 3-1, #5 Claim 3-2)(dcn)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for James B. Bailey. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11756782 by Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc.. Responses due by 7/8/2019 (Rice, Edwin)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(lle)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 17-21018-BKC-LMI, filed by Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc..(lle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. v. Nunez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Nancy Neidich
Represented By: Nancy Neidich Herkert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: United States Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Aleida C. Nunez
Represented By: Gianny Blanco
Represented By: Jacqueline Cisneros Ledon
Represented By: Edward Freire
Represented By: Laila Shilleh Gonzalez
Represented By: Jeffrey Martin Hearne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Edwin Gilbert Rice
Represented By: James B. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?