Government Employees Insurance Co. et al v. Cereceda, et al
Plaintiff: Geico Indemnity Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Government Employees Insurance Co. and Geico Casualty Co.
Defendant: Patrick Louis Fenelus, Mark A Cereceda, Thomas Haban, Edgar Facuseh, Yessica Hernandez, John P. Ross, Yusleivys Gomez Soto, CEDA Orthopedics & Interventional Medicine of F.I.U./Kendall, L.L.C., Karim Habayeb, Yelina M. Hunter Pena, Yunelkys Hidalgo, Nestor Joaquin Javech, Eric Reese, Richard M. Yoham, Virginia Fatato, Roy Canizares, CEDA Orthopedics & Interventional Medicine Of Hialeah, L.L.C., Asuncion Otero, Mayelin Brito Sanchez, Nitte Paredes, Michael B. Schulman, Maria G. Pascucci, Maria Cristina Crespo-Smith, Roberto Moya, Marta Audreu Rodriguez, Omaida Ceballos, Yanet Barbara Zapata, Alex Alonso, CEDA Ortopedics & Interventional Medicine of South Miami, L.L.C., Hernan Pabon, Jorge Aguayo, CEDA Orthopedics & Interventional Medicine of Cutler Bay, LLC, Blanca Baires, CEDA Orthopedics & Interventional Medicine of Downtown/Little Havana, L.L.C., Yuneilis Nunez and Springs Crossing Imaging, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv22206
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allan Aaron Joseph on behalf of Mark A Cereceda. Attorney Allan Aaron Joseph added to party Mark A Cereceda(pty:dft). (Joseph, Allan)
July 26, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Ittleman on behalf of Mark A Cereceda. Attorney Andrew Ittleman added to party Mark A Cereceda(pty:dft). (Ittleman, Andrew)
July 25, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Co.. Michael B. Schulman served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Michael B. Schulman, D.C.)(Marino, John)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time. Joint Scheduling Report due by 9/26/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report re #20 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Co., Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. Responses due by 8/2/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Marino, John)
July 18, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Co.. CEDA Orthopedics & Interventional Medicine Of Hialeah, L.L.C. served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019; CEDA Orthopedics & Interventional Medicine of Cutler Bay, LLC served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for CEDA - Cutler Bay, #2 Affidavit for CEDA - Hialeah)(Marino, John)
July 17, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Co.. John P. Ross served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019; Richard M. Yoham served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for John P. Ross, D.C., #2 Affidavit for Richard M. Yoham, D.C.)(Marino, John)
July 12, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Co.. Mark A Cereceda served on 6/29/2019, answer due 7/22/2019; Karim Habayeb served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019; Roberto Moya served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019; Marta Audreu Rodriguez served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Yanet Barbara Zapata served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Karim Habayeb, D.C., #2 Affidavit for Roberto Moya, M.D., #3 Affidavit for Mark A. Cereceda, D.C., #4 Affidavit for Yanet Barbara Zapata, #5 Affidavit for Marta Audreu Rodriguez)(Marino, John)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that after all Defendants have been served, Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers within the time allowed for the last-served Defendant to respond. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 7/25/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 26, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Co.. Alex Alonso served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019; Blanca Baires served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019; CEDA Orthopedics & Interventional Medicine of Downtown/Little Havana, L.L.C. served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019; CEDA Orthopedics & Interventional Medicine of F.I.U./Kendall, L.L.C. served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019; CEDA Ortopedics & Interventional Medicine of South Miami, L.L.C. served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019; Roy Canizares served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019; Omaida Ceballos served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019; Maria Cristina Crespo-Smith served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019; Edgar Facuseh served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019; Yessica Hernandez served on 6/15/2019, answer due 7/8/2019; Hernan Pabon served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019; Nitte Paredes served on 6/22/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; Eric Reese served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019; Springs Crossing Imaging, L.L.C. served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Yessica Hernandez, #2 Affidavit Eric W. Reese, D.C., #3 Affidavit Omaida Ceballos, #4 Affidavit Blanca Baires, #5 Affidavit Alex Alonso, M.D., #6 Affidavit Edgar Facuseh, D.C, #7 Affidavit Roy Canizares, D.C., #8 Affidavit Nitte Paredes, #9 Affidavit Maria Cristina Crespo-Smith, M.D., #10 Affidavit Herman Pabon, M.D., #11 Affidavit CEDA Orthopedics & Interventional Medicine of Downtown/Little Havana, LLC d/b/a 388-CEDA, #12 Affidavit CEDA Orthopedics & Interventional Medicine of F.I.U./Kendall, LLC d/b/a 388-CEDA, #13 Affidavit CEDA Orthopedics & Interventional Medicine of South Miami, LLC d/b/a 388-CEDA, #14 Affidavit Springs Crossing Imaging, LLC)(Marino, John)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that on or before August 28, 2019, Plaintiffs shall perfect service upon the Defendants or show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to perfect service of process. Failure to file proof of service or show good cause by August 28 will result in a dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Co., Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation for GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Co., Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. (Marino, John)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Christina Bezas. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 4, 2019 Filing 15 Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Christina Bezas. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Co., Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. Responses due by 6/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order on Pro Hac Vice Motion)(Marino, John)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Christina Bezas. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Christina Bezas. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11699146 by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Co., Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. Responses due by 6/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order on Pro Hac Vice Motion)(Marino, John)
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Springs Crossing Imaging, L.L.C.. (ls)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to CEDA Orthopedics & Interventional Medicine of Cutler Bay, LLC. (ls)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to CEDA Ortopedics & Interventional Medicine of South Miami, L.L.C.. (ls)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to CEDA Orthopedics & Interventional Medicine Of Hialeah, L.L.C.. (ls)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to CEDA Orthopedics & Interventional Medicine of F.I.U./Kendall, L.L.C.. (ls)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to CEDA Orthopedics & Interventional Medicine of Downtown/Little Havana, L.L.C.. (ls)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Co., Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. re #1 Complaint,, filed by Geico Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Government Employees Insurance Co., Geico Indemnity Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons - Little Havana, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons - Kendall, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons Hialeah, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons South Miami, #5 Exhibit 5 - Summons - Cutler Bay, #6 Exhibit 6 - Summons - Springs Crossing) (Marino, John)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pcs)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Summons NOT issued for the following reason - Defendant(s) need to be listed first on Summons not Physicians Central Business Office, LLC. (pcs)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jorge Aguayo, Alex Alonso, Blanca Baires, Roy Canizares, Omaida Ceballos, Mark A Cereceda, Maria Cristina Crespo-Smith, Edgar Facuseh, Virginia Fatato, Patrick Louis Fenelus, Thomas Haban, Karim Habayeb, Yessica Hernandez, Yunelkys Hidalgo, Yelina M. Hunter Pena, Nestor Joaquin Javech, Roberto Moya, Yuneilis Nunez, Asuncion Otero, Hernan Pabon, Nitte Paredes, Maria G. Pascucci, Eric Reese, Marta Audreu Rodriguez, John P. Ross, Mayelin Brito Sanchez, Michael B. Schulman, Yusleivys Gomez Soto, Richard M. Yoham, Yanet Barbara Zapata. (pcs)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11686777, filed by Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ceda - Downtown, #2 Exhibit 2 - Ceda - Kendall, #3 Exhibit 3 - Ceda - Hialeah, #4 Exhibit 4 - Ceda - Miami, #5 Exhibit 5 - Ceda - Cutler, #6 Exhibit 6 - Ceda - Springs Crossing, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summon(s) Summon(s))(Marino, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Co. et al v. Cereceda, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Louis Fenelus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A Cereceda
Represented By: Allan Aaron Joseph
Represented By: Andrew Ittleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Haban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar Facuseh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yessica Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yusleivys Gomez Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEDA Orthopedics & Interventional Medicine of F.I.U./Kendall, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karim Habayeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yelina M. Hunter Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yunelkys Hidalgo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestor Joaquin Javech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M. Yoham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Fatato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Canizares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEDA Orthopedics & Interventional Medicine Of Hialeah, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asuncion Otero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayelin Brito Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nitte Paredes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael B. Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria G. Pascucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Cristina Crespo-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Moya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marta Audreu Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omaida Ceballos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yanet Barbara Zapata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Alonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEDA Ortopedics & Interventional Medicine of South Miami, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hernan Pabon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Aguayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEDA Orthopedics & Interventional Medicine of Cutler Bay, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blanca Baires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEDA Orthopedics & Interventional Medicine of Downtown/Little Havana, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yuneilis Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Springs Crossing Imaging, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico Indemnity Co.
Represented By: Lindsey Ryan Trowell
Represented By: Kristen Wenger Bracken
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Christina Bezas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Lindsey Ryan Trowell
Represented By: Kristen Wenger Bracken
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Christina Bezas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Co.
Represented By: Lindsey Ryan Trowell
Represented By: Kristen Wenger Bracken
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Christina Bezas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico Casualty Co.
Represented By: Lindsey Ryan Trowell
Represented By: Kristen Wenger Bracken
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Christina Bezas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?