Burns v. Chuy's Opco, Inc.
Plaintiff: James Burns
Defendant: Chuy's Opco, Inc. d/b/a Chuy's and Chuy's Opco, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv22351
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to #11 Transmittal Letter Sent (ail)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 Transmittal Letter Sent with copy of docket sheet and certified Order of Remand to: 11th Judicial Circuit Court in Miami, FL. State Court Case Number: 2019-012214-CA-01 (ail)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Remanding Case to State Court Closing Case. Granting #9 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Chuy's Opco, Inc. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court by Chuy's Opco, Inc.. (Simpson, Amanda)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint; Chuy's Opco, Inc. Answer due 6/24/2019. Re: #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Chuy's Opco, Inc. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Chuy's Opco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wagner, Lin)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Chuy's Opco, Inc. re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case of Filing State Court Records (Attachments: #1 State Court Records) (Simpson, Amanda)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 6/21/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases; Removal Status Report due by 6/20/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. State Court Records not included. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the State Court Records attached within 24 hours. (amb)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11712601, filed by Chuy's Opco, Inc. d/b/a Chuy's. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Filing, #3 Exhibit Affidavit)(Wagner, Lin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. Chuy's Opco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuy's Opco, Inc. d/b/a Chuy's
Represented By: Lin J Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuy's Opco, Inc.
Represented By: Lin J Wagner
Represented By: Amanda Ann Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Burns
Represented By: David Mitchell Cozad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?