Micheletti v. Pininfarina of America Corp
Plaintiff: Gabrielle Micheletti
Defendant: Pininfarina of America Corp
Case Number: 1:2019cv22381
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/31/2020 in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Calendar Call set for 8/25/2020 AT 11:00 AM before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 7/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Pininfarina of America Corp (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Landen, Michael)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Pininfarina of America Corp. (Landen, Michael)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for good cause shown. Defendant's Response is now due on or before July 18, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 7/16/2019. (js02)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Pininfarina of America Corp. Attorney Michael T. Landen added to party Pininfarina of America Corp(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landen, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for all discovery disputes and Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 6/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Pininfarina of America Corp. (ail)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Corrected by Gabrielle Micheletti re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es) (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Rosenberg, R)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents (amb)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pininfarina of America Corp. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11716010, filed by Gabrielle Micheletti. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Rosenberg, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Micheletti v. Pininfarina of America Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabrielle Micheletti
Represented By: R Edward Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pininfarina of America Corp
Represented By: Michael T. Landen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?