Kenward & Mayoral Dentistry Partnership v. Pinecrest Dentistry, P.A.
Plaintiff: Kenward & Mayoral Dentistry Partnership
Defendant: Pinecrest Dentistry, P.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv22394
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant Pinecrest Dentistry, P.A.'s ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint , Defendant's COUNTERCLAIM against Kenward & Mayoral Dentistry Partnership by Pinecrest Dentistry, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gale, James)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to #1 Complaint, for good cause shown in the unopposed motion:Response/Answer now due 8/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 6/26/2019. (EGT)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Pinecrest Dentistry, P.A.. Attorney James Anthony Gale added to party Pinecrest Dentistry, P.A.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gale, James)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 6/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Non-Dispositive Pretrial and Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 6/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pcs)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (pcs)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Pinecrest Dentistry, P.A.. (pcs)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pcs)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pinecrest Dentistry, P.A.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11717885, filed by Kenward & Mayoral Dentistry Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A - U.S. Trademark Registration No. 5,742,895 for PINECREST DENTAL, #4 Exhibit B - Demand Letter to Pinecrest Dentistry, P.A.)(Trueba, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenward & Mayoral Dentistry Partnership v. Pinecrest Dentistry, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenward & Mayoral Dentistry Partnership
Represented By: William Rafael Trueba, Jr.
Represented By: Roberto Manuel Suarez
Represented By: Darlene Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinecrest Dentistry, P.A.
Represented By: James Anthony Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?