THE BOTANIST COMMERCIAL S.A. v. I-NE CO. LTD.
Plaintiff: THE BOTANIST COMMERCIAL S.A.
Defendant: I-NE CO. LTD.
Case Number: 1:2019cv22397
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT Re: Service Upon Foreign Defendant by THE BOTANIST COMMERCIAL S.A. (Sanchelima, Christian)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO FILE STATUS REPORT REGARDING SERVICE UPON FOREIGN DEFENDANT. Status Report due by 7/19/2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 7/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mee)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to I-NE CO. LTD.. (mee)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mee)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against I-NE CO. LTD.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11718117, filed by THE BOTANIST COMMERCIAL S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit 1)(Sanchelima, Christian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE BOTANIST COMMERCIAL S.A. v. I-NE CO. LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I-NE CO. LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE BOTANIST COMMERCIAL S.A.
Represented By: Christian Jay Sanchelima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?