La Rosa et al v. Sprinklermatic Fire Protection Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Maribel La Rosa, Estate of Noel Alonso and Lazaro Noel Alonso
Defendant: Sprinklermatic Fire Protection Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv22398
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Sprinklermatic Fire Protection Systems, Inc. served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (See image DE #7 ) (vmz)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Maribel La Rosa, Estate of Noel Alonso, Lazaro Noel Alonso. Sprinklermatic Fire Protection Systems, Inc. served on 7/12/2019. (Hassine, Ariel)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lazaro Noel Alonso, Maribel La Rosa, Estate of Noel Alonso (Hassine, Ariel)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Venue on the Civil Cover Sheet does not match the initiating document. The Clerks Office confirmed Miami-Dade (Office - Miami) as the county with the filer. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (vmz)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sprinklermatic Fire Protection Systems, Inc. (vmz)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vmz)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sprinklermatic Fire Protection Systems, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11718202, filed by Maribel La Rosa, Estate of Noel Alonso, Lazaro Noel Alonso. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Hassine, Ariel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: La Rosa et al v. Sprinklermatic Fire Protection Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprinklermatic Fire Protection Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maribel La Rosa
Represented By: Ariel Hassine
Represented By: Connor Throckmorton
Represented By: Arthur Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Noel Alonso
Represented By: Ariel Hassine
Represented By: Connor Throckmorton
Represented By: Arthur Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lazaro Noel Alonso
Represented By: Ariel Hassine
Represented By: Connor Throckmorton
Represented By: Arthur Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?