Wells v. Royal Caribbean International Cruises LTD et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence Wells
Defendant: Balamurugan Kaliyamoorthy, Gabriela Moeanu, Royal Caribbean International Cruises LTD, Catalin Tanase, Luksa Moretic, Toni Caine-Master and Colin J. Clarke
Case Number: 1:2019cv22400
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint, for good cause shown. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge; granting #9 Motion to Appoint Special Process Server to serve Amended Complaint - US Marshal directed to serve amended complaint via Rule 4(d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 7/30/2019. (EGT)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #9 MOTION to Add Defendant Re: #3 Complaint filed by Lawrence Wells. (cds)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Add Defendant to my Claim Re: #3 Complaint, ( Responses due by 7/8/2019), and MOTION to the Court to Serve All Defendants In Forma Pauperis by Lawrence Wells. (ar2)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Lawrence Wells to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: wlawrence257@gmail.com (ar2)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 Notice and Consent to Jurisdiction US Magistrate Judge NOT SIGNED by all parties. Filed by Lawrence Wells (ar2)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERRAL, Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters And Notice of Court Practices and Procedures. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 6/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-02293. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(bb).
June 10, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Lawrence Wells re #2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (adg)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Lawrence Wells. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, Miami Division. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 6/10/2019. (adg)
May 23, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (rlb)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lawrence Wells. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rlb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells v. Royal Caribbean International Cruises LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Balamurugan Kaliyamoorthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriela Moeanu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Caribbean International Cruises LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catalin Tanase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luksa Moretic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toni Caine-Master
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colin J. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?