JJ RENDON & ASSOCIATES STRATEGIC CREATIVITY, LLC et al v. ARZU
Plaintiff: Juan Jose Rendon Delgado and JJ RENDON & ASSOCIATES STRATEGIC CREATIVITY, LLC
Defendant: ROBERTO ARZU
Case Number: 1:2019cv22424
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Vacating #6 and Cancelling Order Setting Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 07/26/2019 at 11:00am before Judge Ursula Ungaro.. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 6/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) Modified title text on 6/21/2019 (asl).
June 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings per order DE#6 . Joint Scheduling Report due by 7/12/2019 (drz)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 VACATED PER ORDER DE#7 -ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Scheduling Conference set for 7/26/2019 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 6/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) Modified on 6/21/2019 (drz).
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 6/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JJ RENDON & ASSOCIATES STRATEGIC CREATIVITY, LLC, Juan Jose Rendon Delgado (Cuza, Jesus)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ROBERTO ARZU. (drz)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROBERTO ARZU. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11722315, filed by JJ RENDON & ASSOCIATES STRATEGIC CREATIVITY, LLC, Juan Jose Rendon Delgado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Contract, #3 Exhibit B - Recorded Final Judgment, #4 Exhibit C - Writ of Bodily Attachment, #5 Summon(s))(Cuza, Jesus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JJ RENDON & ASSOCIATES STRATEGIC CREATIVITY, LLC et al v. ARZU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Jose Rendon Delgado
Represented By: Jesus E. Cuza
Represented By: Monica Vila
Represented By: Alec Michael Puig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JJ RENDON & ASSOCIATES STRATEGIC CREATIVITY, LLC
Represented By: Jesus E. Cuza
Represented By: Monica Vila
Represented By: Alec Michael Puig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERTO ARZU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?