Despeines v. EDS Service Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff: Dupenski Despeines
Defendant: EDS Service Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv22463
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Lauren Fleischer Louis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Dupenski Despeines. Replies due by 8/13/2019. (Harris, Robert)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Marlene Quintana. Mediation Hearing set for 11/14/2019 10:00 AM Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 7/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
July 25, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by EDS Service Solutions, LLC re #9 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,, of Filing Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation (Joint) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Kodsi, Neil)
July 24, 2019 Set Deadlines Per DE 17 as to #4 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Responses due by 8/6/2019 (vmz)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall respond to the Motion to Dismiss by August 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 7/24/2019. (mpn)
July 23, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 15 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer, #4 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Dupenski Despeines. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Robert)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall respond to the Motion to Dismiss by July 23, 2019 Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 7/16/2019. (mpn)
July 16, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #10 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines, by Dupenski Despeines. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Robert)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 7/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (aw)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 11 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney, into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Sonya Locke. (Miller, Jason)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 Clerks Notice to Filer re #7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties and add the additional parties. (jas)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO MOTION re #4 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by EDS Service Solutions, LLC, (Responses due by 7/16/2019) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 7/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Amended Pleadings due by 9/6/2019., Discovery due by 3/24/2020., Fact Discovery due by 3/24/2020., Expert Discovery due by 3/24/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 9/6/2019., Mediation Deadline 4/7/2020., In Limine Motions due by 4/15/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2020., Motions due by 4/15/2020., Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/6/2020., Jury Trial set for 7/20/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 7/14/2020 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 4/7/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 7/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dupenski Despeines (Harris, Robert)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by EDS Service Solutions, LLC (Kodsi, Neil)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by EDS Service Solutions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kodsi, Neil)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by EDS Service Solutions, LLC re #3 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report,, Set Answer Due Deadline, OF FILING (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Kodsi, Neil)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by EDS Service Solutions, LLC. Responses due by 7/8/2019 (Kodsi, Neil)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON POST-REMOVAL PROCEDURES, AND REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report due by 7/5/2019. EDS Service Solutions, LLC Answer or response to complaint due 6/20/2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11728068, filed by EDS Service Solutions, LLC. No Motion to Dismiss and/or Answer has been attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kodsi, Neil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Despeines v. EDS Service Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dupenski Despeines
Represented By: Robert Newton Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDS Service Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Neil David Kodsi
Represented By: Jason Spencer Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?