Lux Brands, LLC v. Federal Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Lux Brands, LLC
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company and ACE American Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv22481
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Becerra
Referring Judge: K Michael Moore
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 18 Transmittal Letter Sent with Order of Remand to: : 11th Judicial Circuit Court. State Court Case Number: 19-0133754-CA-01 (cqs)
July 25, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (jm01)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. #14 . Therein, Plaintiff argues that there is no diversity jurisdiction because the actual cash value of the subject vehicle was approximately $45,000 and therefore, the amount in controversy does not exceed the jurisdictional threshold of $75,000. #14 at 2. Defendant responded consenting to the Plaintiff's Motion to Remand because Plaintiff stipulated that the actual cash value of the subject vehicle is $45,000. #16 . Because the amount in controversy in this matter does not exceed $75,000, this Court does not have jurisdiction over this case. Accordingly, UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion to Remand is GRANTED and the above-styled matter is REMANDED to the Eleventh Judicial Circuit in and for Miami-Dade County, Florida. The Clerk of Court is instructed to CLOSE this case. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 7/25/2019. (jm01)
July 24, 2019 Filing 16 Defendant's RESPONSE to #14 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by ACE American Insurance Company. (Bill, Michael)
July 11, 2019 Filing 15 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by ACE American Insurance Company. (Bill, Michael)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Lux Brands, LLC. (Santisteban, Carlos)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Trial having been set in this matter for the two week trial period beginning March 2, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure and Rule 16.2 of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED as follows: 1. All parties are required to participate in mediation. The mediation shall be completed no later than eighty (80) days before the scheduled trial date. 2. Plaintiff's counsel, or another attorney agreed upon by all counsel of record and any unrepresented parties, shall be responsible for scheduling the mediation conference. The parties are encouraged to avail themselves of the services of any mediator on the List of Certified Mediators, maintained in the office of the Clerk of this Court, but may select any other mediator. The parties shall agree upon a mediator and file a Notice of Mediator Selection within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order. If there is no agreement, lead counsel shall file a request for the Clerk of Court to appoint a mediator in writing within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order, and the Clerk shall designate a mediator from the List of Certified Mediators. Designation shall be made on a blind rotation basis. 3. A place, date, and time for mediation convenient to the mediator, counsel of record, and unrepresented parties shall be established. If the parties cannot agree to a place, date, and time for the mediation, they may motion the Court for an order dictating the place, date, and time. 4. The physical presence of counsel and each party or representatives of each party with full authority to enter in a full and complete compromise and settlement is mandatory. If insurance is involved, an adjuster with authority up to the policy limits or the most recent demand, whichever is lower, shall attend. 5. All discussions, representations and statements made at the mediation conference shall be confidential and privileged. 6. At least ten (10) days prior to the mediation date, all parties shall present to the mediator a brief written summary of the case identifying issues to be resolved. Copies of those summaries shall be served on all other parties. 7. The Court may impose sanctions against parties and/or counsel who do not comply with the attendance or settlement authority requirements herein, or who otherwise violate the terms of this Order. The mediator shall report non-attendance and may recommend imposition of sanctions by the Court for non-attendance. 8. The mediator shall be compensated in accordance with the standing order of the Court entered pursuant to Rule 16.2.B.6, or on such basis as may be agreed to in writing by the parties and the mediator selected by the parties. The cost of mediation shall be shared equally by the parties unless otherwise ordered by the Court. All payments shall be remitted to the mediator within 30 days of the date of the bill. Notice to the mediator of cancellation or settlement prior to the scheduled mediation conference must be given at least two (2) full business days in advance. Failure to do so will result in imposition of a fee for one hour. 9. If a full or partial settlement is reached in this case, counsel shall promptly notify the Court of the settlement in accordance with Local Rule 16.2.F, by filing a notice of settlement signed by the counsel of record within ten (10) days of the mediation conference. Thereafter, the parties shall forthwith submit an appropriate pleading concluding the case. 10. Within five (5) days following the mediation conference, the mediator shall file a Mediation Report indicating whether all required parties were present. The report shall also indicate whether the case settled (in full or in part), was continued with the consent of the parties, or whether the mediator declared an impasse. 11. If mediation is not conducted, the case may be stricken from the trial calendar, and other sanctions may be imposed. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 7/8/2019. (eso)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL IN MIAMI. This case is now set for trial commencing the two week trial period of March 2, 2020, at 9 a.m. in Courtroom 13-1, (thirteenth floor) United States Courthouse, 400 North Miami Avenue, Miami, Florida. All parties are directed to report to the calendar call on February 27, 2020, at 2 p.m., at which time all matters relating to the scheduled trial date may be brought to the attention of the Court. A final pretrial conference as provided for by Rule 16, Fed. R. Civ. P., and Rule 16.1(C), S.D. Fla. L.R., is scheduled for February 18, 2020, at 11 a.m. A bilateral pretrial stipulation and all other pretrial preparations shall be completed NO LATER THAN FIVE DAYS PRIOR TO THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. All motions to amend the pleadings or to join additional parties must be filed by the later of forty-five (45) days after the date of entry of this Order, or forty-five (45) days after the first responsive pleading by the last responding defendant. Any and all pretrial motions, including motions for summary judgment, Daubert motions, and motions in limine must be filed no later than eighty (80) days prior to the trial date. Responses to summary judgment motions must be filed no later than fourteen (14) days after service of the motion, and replies in support of the motion must be filed no later than seven (7) days after service of the response, with both deadlines computed as specified in Rule 6, Fed. R. Civ. P. Each party is limited to one Daubert motion. If all evidentiary issues cannot be addressed in a 20-page memorandum, the parties must file for leave to exceed the page limit. Each party is also limited to one motion in limine (other than Daubert motions). If all evidentiary issues cannot be addressed in a 20-page memorandum, the parties must file for leave to exceed the page limit. Rule 26(a)(2) expert disclosures shall be completed one hundred thirty (130) days prior to the date of trial. All discovery, including expert discovery, shall be completed one hundred (100) days prior to the date of trial. The failure to engage in discovery pending settlement negotiations shall not be grounds for continuance of the trial date. All exhibits must be pre-marked, and a typewritten exhibit list setting forth the number and description of each exhibit must be submitted at the time of trial. Plaintiff's exhibits shall be marked numerically with the letter "P" as a prefix. Defendant's exhibits shall be marked numerically with the letter "D" as a prefix. For a jury trial, counsel shall prepare and submit proposed jury instructions to the Court. The Parties shall submit their proposed jury instructions and verdict form jointly, although they do not need to agree on each proposed instruction. Where the parties do not agree on a proposed instruction, that instruction shall be set forth in bold type. Instructions proposed only by a plaintiff should be underlined. Instructions proposed only by a defendant should be italicized. Every instruction must be supported by citation to authority. The parties should use the Eleventh Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions for Civil Cases as a guide, including the directions to counsel contained therein. The parties shall jointly file their proposed jury instructions via CM/ECF, and shall also submit their proposed jury instructions to the Court via e-mail at moore@flsd.uscourts.gov in WordPerfect or Word format. For a non-jury trial, the parties shall prepare and submit to the Court proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law fully supported by the evidence, which counsel expects the trial to develop, and fully supported by citations to law. The proposed jury instructions or the proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law shall be submitted to the Court no later than five (5) business days prior to the scheduled trial date. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit's Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court. THE FILING BY COUNSEL OF A "NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY" BY MOTION OR OTHERWISE IS NOT PROVIDED FOR UNDER THE LOCAL RULES AND SHALL NOT BE PRESUMED TO ALTER OR MODIFY THE COURT'S SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 7/8/2019. (eso)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by ACE American Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bill, Michael)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against Federal Insurance Company, filed by Lux Brands, LLC.(Santisteban, Carlos)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cody S Pflueger on behalf of Federal Insurance Company. Attorney Cody S Pflueger added to party Federal Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Pflueger, Cody)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon the Parties' Stipulation for Amendment by Interlineation. #7 . Therein, the Parties agree that the Complaint improperly names Defendant Federal Insurance Company and should instead name ACE American Insurance Company, the insurance carrier reflected in the insurance policy attached to Plaintiff's Complaint. Id. at 1. Therefore, the Parties stipulate that the Complaint shall be amended by interlineation to reflect the proper defendant insurance carrier and that all references to "Federal Insurance Company" shall now reflect "ACE American Insurance Company." Id. at 2. The Parties also indicate that counsel for Defendant is also counsel for ACE American Insurance Company and agree that service upon ACE American Insurance Company is not necessary. Id. UPON CONSIDERATION of the Stipulation, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint on the docket reflecting the proper defendant on or before June 27, 2019. ACE American Insurance Company shall file a response to the Amended Complaint within twenty (20) days of Plaintiff's filing of the Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 6/20/2019. (eso)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Amendment by Interlineation by Lux Brands, LLC (Santisteban, Carlos)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACQUELINE BECERRA. PURSUANT to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-captioned Cause is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra to take all necessary and proper action as required by law with respect to any and all pretrial discovery matters. Any motion affecting deadlines set by the Court's Scheduling Order is excluded from this referral, unless specifically referred by separate Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall comply with Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra's discovery procedures. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 6/17/2019. (eso)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS PRETRIAL ORDER. THIS ORDER has been entered upon the filing of a Notice of Removal. Counsel for the removing party is hereby ORDERED to forward a copy of this Order to all other parties. It is further ORDERED that S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1 shall apply to this case and the parties shall hold a scheduling conference within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order. Within ten (10) days of the scheduling conference, counsel shall file a Joint Scheduling Report. The report shall indicate the proposed month and year for the trial and the estimated number of days required for trial. The scheduling conference may be held via telephone. At the conference, the parties shall comply with the following agenda that the Court adopts from S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1: (1) Documents (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.1 and 2) The parties shall determine the procedure for exchanging a copy of, or a description by category and location of, all documents and other evidence that is reasonably available and that a party expects to offer, or may offer, if the need arises. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(B). (A) Documents include computations of the nature and extent of any category of damages claimed by the disclosing party unless the computations are privileged or otherwise protected from disclosure. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(C). (B) Documents include insurance agreements which may be at issue with the satisfaction of the judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(D). (2) List of Witnesses - The parties shall exchange the name, address, and telephone number of each individual known to have knowledge of the facts supporting the material allegations of the pleading filed by the party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A). The parties have a continuing obligation to disclose this information. (3) Discussions and Deadlines (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.2) - The parties shall discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibility of a prompt settlement or resolution of the case. Failure to comply with this Order or to exchange the information listed above may result in sanctions and/or the exclusion of documents or witnesses at the time of trial. S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.I. Failure of counsel to file a joint scheduling report may result in remand or dismissal, default, and the imposition of other sanctions including attorney's fees and costs. The filing of a motion to dismiss, or other motion, does not toll the time for filing a joint scheduling report. Counsel for the non-removing party must file a motion to remand the case on the basis of any defect other than lack of subject matter jurisdiction within thirty (30) days after the filing of the Notice of Removal. The parties are hereby on notice that this Court requires all filings to be formatted in 12 point Times New Roman font and double spaced, including any footnotes, with one-inch margins on all sides. Failure to follow these formatting guidelines may result in the filing being stricken, any opposing filing being granted by default, and the imposition of other sanctions, including attorney's fees and costs. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit's Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court. Telephonic appearances are not permitted for any purpose. Upon reaching a settlement in this matter the parties are instructed to notify the Court by telephone and to file a Notice of Settlement within twenty-four (24) hours. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 6/17/2019. (eso)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Federal Insurance Company Civil Cover Sheet #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - COMPLAINT) (Bill, Michael)Link Added on 6/17/2019 (ail).
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (amb)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - COMPLAINT) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11731422, filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Bill, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lux Brands, LLC v. Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Todd Bill
Represented By: Cody S Pflueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Todd Bill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lux Brands, LLC
Represented By: Carlos Santisteban, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?