McNeal et al v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Maurice Symonette and Curtis McNeal
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, Axiom Financial Services, SEC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems (MERS), Residential Funding Co. LLC and Residential Funding Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv22503
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James Lawrence King
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:2409
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 7/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (ra)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicole Rory Topper on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association. Attorney Nicole Rory Topper added to party U.S. Bank National Association(pty:dft). (Topper, Nicole)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint, by U.S. Bank National Association. Responses due by 7/16/2019 (Ehrlich, David)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David S Ehrlich on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association. Attorney David S Ehrlich added to party U.S. Bank National Association(pty:dft). (Ehrlich, David)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge James Lawrence King recused. Case reassigned to Judge Kathleen M. Williams for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 6/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (yar)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Curtis McNeal. (pcs)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR: QUIET TITLE against Axiom Financial Services, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems (MERS), Residential Funding Co. LLC, Residential Funding Corporation, SEC, U.S. Bank National Association. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Curtis McNeal, Maurice Symonette. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(pcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeal et al v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Symonette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis McNeal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Nicole Rory Topper
Represented By: David S Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axiom Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems (MERS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Funding Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Funding Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?