MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC et al v. Wright Medical Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: MSPA Claims 1, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC and SERIES PMPI
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc. and Wright Medical Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv22544
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 15 Transmittal Letter Sent with ORDER REMANDING CASE to: 11th Juducial Circuit, Miami-Dade County. State Court Case Number: 19-014688-CA-01. (drz)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REMANDING CASE,denying as moot #5 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying as moot #6 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot #6 Motion for Hearing; granting #7 Motion to Remand to State Court. Closing Case. Motions Terminated: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Wright Medical Group, Inc., #7 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by SERIES PMPI, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, #6 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION for Hearing filed by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 7/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI. (Ruiz, John)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI. Replies due by 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J)(Ruiz, John)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION for Hearing filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI. Replies due by 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Moreno, Gino)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. Replies due by 7/18/2019. (Gurland, Harvey)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file its response to Defendants' motions to dismiss #5 , #6 on or before July 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 7/8/2019. (sgi)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION for Hearing , #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moreno, Gino)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI. Attorney Gino Moreno added to party MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Gino Moreno added to party MSPA Claims 1, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Gino Moreno added to party SERIES PMPI(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Moreno, Gino)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), , MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 7/10/2019), MOTION for Hearing by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gurland, Harvey)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Wright Medical Group, Inc.. Responses due by 7/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gurland, Harvey)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wright Medical Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wright Medical Group, N.V. for Wright Medical Group, Inc. (Gurland, Harvey)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Pure Bill of Discovery) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11745223, filed by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Gurland, Harvey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC et al v. Wright Medical Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Harvey W. Gurland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Harvey W. Gurland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSPA Claims 1, LLC
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Represented By: Gino Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Represented By: Gino Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERIES PMPI
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Represented By: Gino Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?