Las Originales Pizza Inc. et al v. BATABANO GROUP, INC. et al

Plaintiff: MONTE PIZZA INC., and Las Originales Pizza Inc.
Defendant: Batabano Group III, Inc., Batabano Group II, Inc., BATABANO GROUP, INC., Luis Pena and Yamilin Mederos
Case Number: 1:2019cv22553
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Stay in Favor of Related State Court Proceeding filed by Las Originales Pizza Inc., MONTE PIZZA INC.,. Replies due by 8/21/2019. (Sanchelima, Jesus)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by BATABANO GROUP, INC., Batabano Group II, Inc., Batabano Group III, Inc., Yamilin Mederos, Luis Pena (Guerra, Richard)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Take Judicial Notice by BATABANO GROUP, INC., Batabano Group II, Inc., Batabano Group III, Inc., Yamilin Mederos, Luis Pena. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Guerra, Richard)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay in Favor of Related State Court Proceeding by BATABANO GROUP, INC., Batabano Group II, Inc., Batabano Group III, Inc., Yamilin Mederos, Luis Pena. Responses due by 8/14/2019 (Guerra, Richard)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by BATABANO GROUP, INC., Batabano Group II, Inc., Batabano Group III, Inc., Yamilin Mederos, Luis Pena. (Guerra, Richard)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Samuel Polk on behalf of BATABANO GROUP, INC., Luis Pena. Attorney Edward Samuel Polk added to party BATABANO GROUP, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Edward Samuel Polk added to party Luis Pena(pty:dft). (Polk, Edward)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Guerra on behalf of BATABANO GROUP, INC., Batabano Group II, Inc., Batabano Group III, Inc., Yamilin Mederos, Luis Pena. Attorney Richard Guerra added to party BATABANO GROUP, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Richard Guerra added to party Batabano Group II, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Richard Guerra added to party Batabano Group III, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Richard Guerra added to party Yamilin Mederos(pty:dft), Attorney Richard Guerra added to party Luis Pena(pty:dft). (Guerra, Richard)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ebz)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BATABANO GROUP, INC., Batabano Group II, Inc., Batabano Group III, Inc., Yamilin Mederos, Luis Pena. (ebz)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BATABANO GROUP, INC., Batabano Group II, Inc., Batabano Group III, Inc., Yamilin Mederos, Luis Pea. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11747286, filed by Las Originales Pizza Inc., MONTE PIZZA INC.,. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13)(Sanchelima, Jesus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Las Originales Pizza Inc. et al v. BATABANO GROUP, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTE PIZZA INC.,
Represented By: Jesus Sanchelima
Represented By: Christian Jay Sanchelima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Las Originales Pizza Inc.
Represented By: Jesus Sanchelima
Represented By: Christian Jay Sanchelima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Batabano Group III, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Batabano Group II, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BATABANO GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Edward Samuel Polk
Represented By: Richard Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Pena
Represented By: Edward Samuel Polk
Represented By: Richard Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yamilin Mederos
Represented By: Richard Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?