Larreal v. Telemundo of Florida, LLC
Plaintiff: Merwin Larreal
Defendant: Telemundo of Florida, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv22613
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (kou) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Telemundo of Florida, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment C, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Shullman, Deanna)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Telemundo of Florida, LLC. (Shullman, Deanna)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters; Notice re Joint Motions. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (kou)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Telemundo of Florida, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Comcast Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Comcast DW Holding, Inc., Corporate Parent NBCUniversal Enterprises, Inc., Corporate Parent SNL Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Comcast Snap Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent E! Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Comcast SportsNet NE Holdings, Inc. for Telemundo of Florida, LLC (Shullman, Deanna)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11758344, filed by Telemundo of Florida, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shullman, Deanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larreal v. Telemundo of Florida, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telemundo of Florida, LLC
Represented By: Deanna Kendall Shullman
Represented By: Giselle M. Girones
Represented By: Lynn Diane Carrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merwin Larreal
Represented By: Gustavo Daniel Lage
Represented By: Augusto Ramon Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?