Henry v. Florida Department of Corrections
Plaintiff: Devonte Henry
Defendant: State of Florida, Secretary Florida Department of Corrections, Florida Attorney General and Officer J. Martinez
Case Number: 1:2019cv22691
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Florida Attorney General, Florida Department of Corrections, J. Martinez, filed by Devonte Henry. (Attachments: #1 Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights (Prisoner Complaint).)(jas)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO AMEND AND CLARIFY on or before July 31, 2019, Mr. Henry shall file an amended version of his filing. ( Amended Complaint due by 7/31/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 2254 Complaint Form, #2 1983 Complaint Form) (fbn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction. Document 5 Restricted Due to Error. (fbn)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PAPERLESS ORDER instructing the Clerk to correct the identity of the Respondent listed on the docket to Mark S. Inch, Secretary for the Florida Department of Corrections, as he is Petitioner's legal custodian. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid (bca)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (kpe)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254, filed by Devonte Henry. Filing fee $ 5.00. NOT PAID/NO IFP FILED. (kpe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry v. Florida Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Florida
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Florida Department of Corrections
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Attorney General
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer J. Martinez
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devonte Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?