JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. v. Conquest Financial Management Corp. et al
Plaintiff: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Defendant: Gerald Shvartsman, Michael Shvartsman and Conquest Financial Management Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv22712
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference, or to Permit Counsel for Co-Defendant to Appear for Them. Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 10/11/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
August 19, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Planning and Scheduling Conference or Permit Counsel for Co-Defendant to Appear for Them re #11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, by Gerald Shvartsman, Michael Shvartsman. Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Fender, George)
August 19, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by George Steven Fender on behalf of Gerald Shvartsman, Michael Shvartsman. Attorney George Steven Fender added to party Gerald Shvartsman(pty:dft), Attorney George Steven Fender added to party Michael Shvartsman(pty:dft). (Fender, George)
August 16, 2019 Filing 19 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (O'Malley, Drew)
August 15, 2019 Filing 18 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Conquest Financial Management Corp. (Feldman, Andrew)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Conquest Financial Management Corp. (Feldman, Andrew)
August 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Compliance by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - DE 06 Order Setting Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference, #2 Exhibit Ex B - DE 11 Order granting motion for extension of time) (O'Malley, Drew)
August 7, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gerald Shvartsman, Michael Shvartsman. Gerald Shvartsman waiver sent on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; Michael Shvartsman waiver sent on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Fender, George)
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Natalie Pedregal Thomas on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Attorney Natalie Pedregal Thomas added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:pla). (Thomas, Natalie)
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Compliance by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #6 Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Order Setting Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Order granting motion for extension of time) (O'Malley, Drew)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Conquest Financial Management Corp.. Attorney Andrew Martin Feldman added to party Conquest Financial Management Corp.(pty:dft). (Feldman, Andrew)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Joint Planning and Scheduling Report due by 8/16/2019. Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference re-set for 8/30/2019 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (pes)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Planning and Scheduling Report and Proposed Scheduling Order by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 8/7/2019 (O'Malley, Drew)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #7 Order to Show Cause by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (O'Malley, Drew)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Conquest Financial Management Corp. served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (O'Malley, Drew)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 7/26/2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. ( Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 8/9/2019 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro). ( Joint Planning and Scheduling Report due by 7/26/2019). Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co for JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (O'Malley, Drew)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Conquest Financial Management Corp., Gerald Shvartsman, Michael Shvartsman. (kpe)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s)) (O'Malley, Drew)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Note and Guaranty against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11778646, filed by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(O'Malley, Drew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. v. Conquest Financial Management Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Shvartsman
Represented By: George Steven Fender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Shvartsman
Represented By: George Steven Fender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conquest Financial Management Corp.
Represented By: Andrew Martin Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Drew Patrick O'Malley
Represented By: Natalie Pedregal Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?