ILC Dover, LP v. FloodBarrier, Inc.
Plaintiff: ILC Dover, LP
Defendant: FloodBarrier, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv22760
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint , Defendant's COUNTERCLAIM against ILC Dover, LP by FloodBarrier, Inc.. (Fields, Alexis)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The Court finds that the application satisfies the requirements of S.D. Fla. Local Atty. R. 4. Therefore, the Clerk is directed to add Thomas P. Pavelko, Esq. as counsel of record for Plaintiff and allow counsel to be noticed electronically on CM/ECF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 7/29/2019. (abu)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 , #10 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The Court finds that the application satisfies the requirements of S.D. Fla. Local Atty. R. 4. Therefore, the Clerk is directed to add Danielle M. Carcich, Esq. and Patrick J. Doran, Esq. as counsel of record for Defendant and allow counsel to be noticed electronically on CM/ECF. Docket Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 7/29/2019. (abu)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Thomas P. Pavelko. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11850331 by ILC Dover, LP. Responses due by 8/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brafman, David)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Patrick J. Doran. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11846081 by FloodBarrier, Inc.. Responses due by 8/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fields, Alexis)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to #1 Complaint, for good cause shown in the unopposed motion:Defendant's Response/Answer now due 8/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 7/25/2019. (EGT)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Danielle M. Karcich. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11845997 by FloodBarrier, Inc.. Responses due by 8/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fields, Alexis)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by FloodBarrier, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fields, Alexis)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexis Fields on behalf of FloodBarrier, Inc.. Attorney Alexis Fields added to party FloodBarrier, Inc.(pty:dft). (Fields, Alexis)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES, referring case to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for all discovery disputes and non-dispositive pretrial motions. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 7/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (ar2)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to FloodBarrier, Inc. (ar2)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FloodBarrier, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11787601, filed by ILC Dover, LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit Patent No. US 9453316, #4 Exhibit Patent No. US 9303423, #5 Exhibit Patent No. US 9453314, #6 Exhibit FloodBarrier Website)(Brafman, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ILC Dover, LP v. FloodBarrier, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FloodBarrier, Inc.
Represented By: Danielle M. Karcich
Represented By: Alexis Fields
Represented By: Patrick J. Doran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ILC Dover, LP
Represented By: David S Brafman
Represented By: Thomas P. Pavelko
Represented By: Amy Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?