Silberman et al v. Quintana et al

Plaintiff: Misil Miracle LLC and Aaron Silberman
Defendant: David Quintana and Miracle Leaf Health Centers, Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv22827
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12:0022
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before David Lichter, Esq.; Mediation Hearing set for 10/25/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
September 6, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Misil Miracle LLC, Aaron Silberman re #17 Scheduling Order,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation) (Flint, Alexander)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 8/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (tb)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. ( Jury Trial set for 7/6/2020 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Calendar Call set for 6/30/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga). Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 16, 2019 Filing 16 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Misil Miracle LLC, Aaron Silberman (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flint, Alexander)
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 Defendants' ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Miracle Leaf Health Centers, Corp., David Quintana. (Joblove, Michael)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Joint Scheduling Report due by 8/16/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report re #8 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report by Misil Miracle LLC, Aaron Silberman. Responses due by 8/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Flint, Alexander)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Misil Miracle LLC, Aaron Silberman identifying Other Affiliate Salomon Mishaan, Other Affiliate Sofia Mishaan-Silberman for Aaron Silberman, Misil Miracle LLC (Flint, Alexander)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Miracle Leaf Health Centers, Corp., David Quintana (Joblove, Michael)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Bild on behalf of Miracle Leaf Health Centers, Corp., David Quintana. Attorney Michael Bild added to party Miracle Leaf Health Centers, Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Bild added to party David Quintana(pty:dft). (Bild, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint; Defendants' combined response or separate answers due 8/13/2019. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Aaron Silberman, Misil Miracle LLC. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 8/9/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers within the time permitted by the rules. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Miracle Leaf Health Centers, Corp., David Quintana. (Joblove, Michael)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Barry Blum on behalf of Miracle Leaf Health Centers, Corp., David Quintana. Attorney William Barry Blum added to party Miracle Leaf Health Centers, Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney William Barry Blum added to party David Quintana(pty:dft). (Blum, William)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael D Joblove on behalf of Miracle Leaf Health Centers, Corp., David Quintana. Attorney Michael D Joblove added to party Miracle Leaf Health Centers, Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael D Joblove added to party David Quintana(pty:dft). (Joblove, Michael)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Miracle Leaf Health Centers, Corp., David Quintana. (mee)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11797553, filed by Aaron Silberman, Misil Miracle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summon(s) David Quintana, #5 Summon(s) Miracle Leaf Health Centers, Corp.)(Flint, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silberman et al v. Quintana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misil Miracle LLC
Represented By: Alexander Flint
Represented By: Irain Alberto Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Silberman
Represented By: Alexander Flint
Represented By: Irain Alberto Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Quintana
Represented By: William Barry Blum
Represented By: Michael Bild
Represented By: Michael D Joblove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miracle Leaf Health Centers, Corp.
Represented By: William Barry Blum
Represented By: Michael Bild
Represented By: Michael D Joblove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?