Charles v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Sean Darren Charles
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv22830
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James Lawrence King
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 7/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (jw)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Sean Darren Charles. Responses due by 8/8/2019 (ra) (Main Document 7 replaced on 7/29/2019) (ra).
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF COVER LETTER by Sean Darren Charles (lk)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDMENT to #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Sean Darren Charles (lk)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Sentencing Transcript)(Telfair, Breezye)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Breezye Telfair on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Breezye Telfair added to party United States of America(pty:dft). (Telfair, Breezye)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (vjk)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241/Motion of Nunc Pro Tunc. Filing fee $ 5.00 NOT PAID/NO IFP, filed by Sean Darren Charles.(vjk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Breezye Telfair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Darren Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?